Somberg et al v. Utica Community Schools

Plaintiff: Jeannine L. Somberg and Dylan S. Somberg
Defendant: Utica Community Schools
Case Number: 2:2013cv11810
Filed: April 23, 2013
Court: Michigan Eastern District Court
County: Macomb
Presiding Judge: Robert H. Cleland
Referring Judge: Michael J. Hluchaniuk
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 5, 2017 125 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Amending September 1, 2017 Order Appointing Special Master. Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag)
September 29, 2017 117 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING in part 108 MOTION to Stay pending appeal 104 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees filed by Utica Community Schools and approving the supersedeas bond obtained from the Great American Insurance Company. Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag)
January 20, 2017 90 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER AWARDING COMPENSATORY EDUCATION, DENYING AS MOOT 43 MOTION to Compel and 49 MOTION in Limine filed by Jeannine L. Somberg, Dylan S. Somberg; DENYING 83 MOTION to Supplement Record and Closing Argument filed by Utica Community Schools; GRANTING 87 MOTION Enter Exhibits filed by Jeannine L. Somberg, Dylan S. Somberg; DENYING AS MOOT 37 MOTION to Compel ADR filed by Utica Community Schools; GRANTING 22 MOTION for Judgment filed by Jeannine L. Somberg, Dylan S. Somberg; DENYING AS MOOT 38 MOTION Continuance of Trial Date , 67 MOTION concerning Joint Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law and Dates for Evide ntiary Hearing and 59 MOTION in Limine filed by Utica Community Schools, and SETTING A STAUS CONFERENCE ( for 3/9/2017 03:30 PM before District Judge Robert H. Cleland) Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag)
July 12, 2016 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Regarding Joint Submission of Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law. Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag)
May 12, 2016 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 31 Plaimtiffs' Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag)
March 30, 2016 30 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION and ORDER DENYING 23 Defendants' Motion for Judgment and GRANTING 22 Plaintiff's MOTION for Judgment and setting ( Status Conference for 4/27/2016 02:00 PM before District Judge Robert H. Cleland) Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag)
March 8, 2016 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to Present Administrative Record. Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Somberg et al v. Utica Community Schools
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeannine L. Somberg
Represented By: Richard J. Alef
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dylan S. Somberg
Represented By: Richard J. Alef
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Utica Community Schools
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?