Arnold et al v. Heyns et al
Plaintiff: Michael Arnold, Daniel Corralez and Eric Lahti
Defendant: Daniel H Heyns, Michael Martin and Brad Purves
Case Number: 2:2013cv14137
Filed: September 27, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Detroit Office
County: Gratiot
Presiding Judge: Paul D. Borman
Presiding Judge: Mona K. Majzoub
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 295 OPINION and ORDER Denying Defendant's 267 Motion for Stay Pending Appeal; and Denying as Moot Plaintiffs' 269 Motion to Strike. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 291 OPINION and ORDER Granting In Part and Denying In Part Defendant's 275 Motion to Strike and Denying Without Prejudice Plaintiffs' 273 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 254 OPINION and ORDER Denying 252 253 Motions by Darryl McGore. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 243 BENCH OPINION. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 159 OPINION and ORDER Granting Plaintiffs' 125 Rule 54(b) Motion. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 158 OPINION and ORDER Denying Defendant's 127 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 157 OPINION and ORDER Granting Plaintiffs' 113 Motion for Class Certification. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
March 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 146 OPINION and ORDER Denying Defendant's 141 Motion for Dismissal Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(1). Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
January 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER re: 140 MOTION for Leave to File an Additional Dispositive Motion:( Response due by 2/9/2018, Reply due by 2/16/2018) Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (JOwe)
November 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 115 OPINION and ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 113 Motion for Class Certification. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
June 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 106 OPINION and ORDER. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
January 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 99 OPINION and ORDER Rejecting Defendants' Objections to Magistrate Judge's 96 Report and Recommendation and Granting Defendants' 65 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
December 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER Denying 90 Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint and Denying 91 Motion for Reconsideration - Signed by Magistrate Judge Mona K. Majzoub. (LBar)
June 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 79 OPINION and ORDER Rejecting Plaintiff's 76 Objections to Magistrate Judge's Order Granting Plaintiff's 69 Motion for Continuance and to Reopen Discovery. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (SBur)
April 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER Granting 69 Motion for Continuance and to Reopen Discovery - Signed by Magistrate Judge Mona K. Majzoub. (LBar)
July 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 61 OPINION and ORDER (1) Adopting Magistrate Judge's 60 Report and Recommendation; (2) Denying Plaintiff's 53 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction; and (3) Denying Defendants' 58 Motion to Dismiss or Sanction Plaintiff. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
June 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER denying 46 Motion to Appoint Counsel; denying 49 Motion Opposing Defendant's Motion to Take Depositions of the Plaintiffs or, in the a alternative, Plaintiff's Motion to Delay such Depositions until after a Case Management Order has been Entered and the Plaintiff's' Motion Including a Motion for the Appointment of Counsel and Discovery have been Ruled upon by this Court and denying 55 Motion to Stay - Signed by Magistrate Judge Mona K. Majzoub. (LBar)
March 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 52 OPINION AND ORDER adopting 50 Report and Recommendation, granting 48 Motion to be dropped from case, denying without prejudice 33 Motion for temporary restraining order and/or preliminary injunction, and denying as moot 44 Motion for discovery and 47 Motion to take plaintiff's deposition.Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (DPer)
December 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER denying 38 Motion to Sever ; granting 43 Motion to Take Deposition ; denying 22 Motion for Appointment of Expert Witness; denying 24 Motion for Discovery and denying 25 Motion for Sanctions - Signed by Magistrate Judge Mona K. Majzoub. (LBar)
June 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 28 OPINION and ORDER (1) Denying Plaintiffs' 3 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction; (2) Denying Defendants' 14 Motion to Dismiss; and (3) Adopting in Part and Rejecting in Part the Magistrate Judge's March 4, 2014 16 Report and Recommendation. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (Loury, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arnold et al v. Heyns et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Corralez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Lahti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel H Heyns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Purves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?