Pouncy v. Palmer
Plaintiff: Omar Rashad Pouncy
Defendant: Carmen D. Palmer
Case Number: 2:2013cv14695
Filed: November 12, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Detroit Office
County: Wayne
Presiding Judge: Sean F. Cox
Presiding Judge: Laurie J. Michelson
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:1651
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 356 ORDER signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman Denying with Prejudice 238 Motion to Dismiss. (KGri)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 354 ORDER Denying 353 Motion for Clarification or Modification of Response Schedule. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 346 ORDER Denying 344 Emergency Motion for Bond. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 340 ORDER on Pending Motions. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 333 ORDER to Appear for Status Conference. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 328 ORDER Terminating Petitioner's 275 , 276 , 280 and 301 Motions as Moot. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 311 ORDER Denying Petitioner's 302 Emergency Motion to Stay Remainder of Sentence. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 307 ORDER Denying Petitioner's 303 Emergency Motion for a Certificate of Appealability. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 295 ORDER Denying Petitioner's 294 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 293 ORDER (1) Denying 292 Motion for Bond and (2) Setting Final Briefing Schedule. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 283 ORDER on Status Conference. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 274 ORDER Striking Petitioner's 273 Pro Se Supplemental Brief. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 268 ORDER Denying Petitioner's 231 Renewed Motion for Respondent to Show Cause Regarding Interference With Attorney-Client Communications. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 246 ORDER (1) Granting in Part Petitioner's 244 Motion to Reconsider Stay of Proceedings, (2) Vacating Stay of Proceedings, and (3) Directing the Filing of Additional Submissions on Respondent's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 228 ORDER Designating Lead Counsel. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ORDER (1) Denying Petitioner's 218 Motion for Immediate Release, (2) Denying Without Prejudice Petitioner's 220 Motion for Order to Show Cause Regarding Interference With Attorney Client Communication and (3) Granting 222 Motion for Oral Argument. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 209 ORDER Denying as Moot (1) Petitioner's 205 Motion for Access to Counsel by Telephone and (2) Petitioner's 204 Motion for Immediate Consideration. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER Denying Without Prejudice Petitioner's 158 Emergency Motion for Bond Pending Resolution of Habeas Claims and Based on Actual Innocence. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
June 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER Setting Schedule and Page Limits for Post-Hearing Briefing. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
January 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER Denying 165 Motion for Entry of Final Judgment on Public Trial Claim. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
December 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER Denying Petitioner's 150 Rule 60(b)/Rule 54(b) Motion. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER Denying Certificate of Appealability. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
September 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER (1) Denying Petitioner's 139 Rule 60(b) Motion and (2) Terminating Petitioner's 146 Motion for Immediate Consideration as Moot. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER Denying Without Prejudice Petitioner's 124 Motion to Retain Petitioner in Present Federal District During Current Appeal and Post-Appeal Habeas Corpus. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
April 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER (1) Granting 134 MOTION for Immediate Consideration and (2) Granting in Part 133 MOTION to Appoint Counsel. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
March 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER on Status Conference. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
January 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER Denying Petitioner's 121 Motion for Clarification. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
December 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER Denying Petitioner's 119 Motion to Reinstate Bond. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
September 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER on Petition for Action on Conditions of Pretrial Release. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
August 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER Amending Bond Conditions. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
May 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER on Petition for Action on Conditions of Pretrial Release. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
May 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER to Appear at Hearing on Respondent's 109 Emergency MOTION for Order to Revoke Petitioner Bond. (Response due by 2:00 p.m. on 5/4/2016, Motion Hearing set for 5/5/2016 at 2:00 PM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman.) Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
March 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER Denying Petitioner's 96 Motion to Reduce Time to Appeal Order Granting Bond to Fourteen Days Per Respondent's Request. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
March 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER Denying Petitioner's 81 Motion to Bar Re-Prosecution. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
March 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 93 OPINION AND ORDER (1) Granting Petitioner's 80 Motion for Release on Bond and Staying Grant of Bond for 21 Days, (2) Granting Respondent's 85 Motion for Stay Pending Appeal, (3) Denying Petitioner's 82 Motion to Reduce Time to Comply with Conditional Writ as Moot, and (4) Denying Petitioner's 92 Motion for Oral Argument. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
January 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 76 AMENDED OPINION AND ORDER Conditionally Granting Writ of Habeas Corpus. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (AChu)
January 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 74 OPINION AND ORDER Conditionally Granting Writ of Habeas Corpus. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
August 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER Denying Petitioner's 60 MOTION for Reconsideration and Directing Respondent to Respond to Petitioner's Request to Amend His Habeas Petition. (Response due by 9/10/2015.) Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
July 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER Terminating as Moot Petitioner's 32 MOTION for Oral Argument and 31 MOTION For Immediate Consideration; and Granting in Part and Denying in Part Petitioner's 34 MOTION to Redocket Previously Filed Motions. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
April 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER on Status Conference and Denying Petitioner's 45 MOTION for Clarification of Oral Argument and 46 MOTION to Enforce Waiver of Waived Defenses. (Responent's Affidavit in Support of Opposition to Petition er's Motion for Summary Judgment due by 5:00 p.m. on 5/1/2015, Petitioner's Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment and Two Attachments in Response to Respondent's Affidavit due by 5:00 p.m. on 5/8/2015.) Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (Monda, H)
April 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER Denying 40 Motion to Limit Respondent's Scope of Supplemental Briefing. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (Monda, H)
March 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER for Supplemental Briefing by Both Parties as to 33 MOTION for Summary Judgment: (Supplemental Briefs due by 4/15/2015.) Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (Monda, H)
January 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER re 25 Motion to Clarify DQ, Vacate Prev Orders, etc. by All Plaintiffs. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC)
November 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 20 OPINION and ORDER DENYING 17 MOTION For Referral of Petition, Motion For Summary Disposition, and Related Matters to Magistrate Judge, DENYING 18 Emergency MOTION for Bond, DENYING 16 MOTION For Oral Argument Of Hab eas Corpus Petition, Motion For Summary Disposition, and Related Matters, DENYING 14 MOTION for Reconsideration re 11 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Petitioner Omar Rashad Pouncy, and Allowing Respondent Time to File Additional Responsive Pleading. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pouncy v. Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Omar Rashad Pouncy
Represented By: David L. Moffitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carmen D. Palmer
Represented By: Laura Moody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?