Smith v. Consolidated Rail Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Robert Smith
Defendant: Consolidated Rail Corporation and Norfolk Southern Company
Case Number: 2:2014cv10426
Filed: January 29, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Detroit Office
County: Wayne
Presiding Judge: Gershwin A. Drain
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER Dismissing Plaintiff's 1 Complaint With Prejudice. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
December 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER Conditionally Granting 36 MOTION to Withdraw as Counsel and Requiring Robert Smith Personally to Show Cause Why this Action Should Not Be Dismissed With Prejudice. (Show Cause Response due by close of business on 1/25/2016.) Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
September 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Denying (1) Defendant Consolidated Rail Corporation's 15 Motion for Summary Judgment, and (2) Requiring Parties to Attend Settlement Conference. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
June 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 3 Motion to Strike Defendants' Notice of Non-Involved Parties. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (Monda, H)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Consolidated Rail Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Smith
Represented By: Carl L. Collins, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Consolidated Rail Corporation
Represented By: Joseph J. McDonnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?