Vinson v. Department of Corrections, State of Michigan et al
Plaintiff: Antonio Vinson
Defendant: Department of Corrections, State of Michigan, Corizon Corporation, Richard Miles, M.D., Karen M. Rhodes, D.O., Eddie Jenkins, M.D., Bhamini Sudhir, M.D., Karen Hamblin, R.N., Patricia F Faling,, Arayan K. Taymour, P.A., Staci M. Royer-Thompson, R.N., Cindy Speer, R.N., James L. Hense, Dawn L. Lybarger, N.P., Kelly M. Wellman, R.N., Janene Edwards, Frances I. Hinsley, Adrienne Neff, P.A., Cindy L. Murphy, Sharon Paratchek, Joyce Hunter, Assistant Warden Campbell and Laura Kinder
Case Number: 2:2014cv11130
Filed: March 17, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Detroit Office
County: Jackson
Presiding Judge: Sean F. Cox
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Hluchaniuk
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 239 ORDER Adopting 236 Report and Recommendation re 198 Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by Arayan K. Taymour, P.A., Corizon Corporation, Karen M. Rhodes, D.O., Dawn L. Lybarger, N.P., Eddie Jenkins, M.D., Richard Miles, M.D. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC)
April 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 226 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 216 Motion to Strike. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie Dawkins Davis. (Brown, A.)
March 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 225 OPINION AND ORDER Overruling 214 Objection re 209 Order on Motion. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC)
April 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER Overruling 148 Objections filed by Antonio Vinson. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC)
January 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER Regarding 86 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 66 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Arayan K. Taymour, P.A., Adrienne Neff, P.A., Corizon Corporation, Dawn L. Lybarger, N.P., Eddie Jenkins, M.D., Richard Miles, M.D., Karen M. Rhodes, D.O., Bhamini Sudhir, M.D., 65 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by Sharon Paratchek, 69 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC)
March 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER Accepting and Adopting in Part and Rejecting in Part 48 Second Amended Report and Recommendation re 22 Motion to Dismiss filed by Sharon Paratchek, 37 Motion to Strike filed by Antonio Vinson, 19 Motion to Dismiss, filed by Department of Corrections, State of Michigan, Patricia F Faling,, Staci M. Royer-Thompson, R.N., Laura Kinder, Cindy L. Murphy, Assistant Warden Campbell, Janene Edwards, Joyce Hunter, Cindy Speer, R.N., James L. Hense, Kelly M. Wellman, R.N., Frances I. Hinsley, Karen Hamblin, R.N. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vinson v. Department of Corrections, State of Michigan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Vinson
Represented By: Lennox Emanuel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Corrections, State of Michigan
Represented By: A. Peter Govorchin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corizon Corporation
Represented By: Ronald W. Chapman
Represented By: Kimberley A. Koester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Miles, M.D.
Represented By: Ronald W. Chapman
Represented By: Kimberley A. Koester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen M. Rhodes, D.O.
Represented By: Ronald W. Chapman
Represented By: Kimberley A. Koester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eddie Jenkins, M.D.
Represented By: Ronald W. Chapman
Represented By: Kimberley A. Koester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bhamini Sudhir, M.D.
Represented By: Ronald W. Chapman
Represented By: Kimberley A. Koester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Hamblin, R.N.
Represented By: A. Peter Govorchin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia F Faling,
Represented By: A. Peter Govorchin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arayan K. Taymour, P.A.
Represented By: Ronald W. Chapman
Represented By: Kimberley A. Koester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Staci M. Royer-Thompson, R.N.
Represented By: A. Peter Govorchin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cindy Speer, R.N.
Represented By: A. Peter Govorchin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James L. Hense
Represented By: A. Peter Govorchin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dawn L. Lybarger, N.P.
Represented By: Ronald W. Chapman
Represented By: Kimberley A. Koester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly M. Wellman, R.N.
Represented By: A. Peter Govorchin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janene Edwards
Represented By: A. Peter Govorchin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frances I. Hinsley
Represented By: A. Peter Govorchin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adrienne Neff, P.A.
Represented By: Ronald W. Chapman
Represented By: Kimberley A. Koester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cindy L. Murphy
Represented By: A. Peter Govorchin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharon Paratchek
Represented By: A. Peter Govorchin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joyce Hunter
Represented By: A. Peter Govorchin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Assistant Warden Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Kinder
Represented By: A. Peter Govorchin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?