Kheibari v. Rite Aid Corporation
Plaintiff: Michael Kheibari
Defendant: Rite Aid Corporation
Case Number: 2:2014cv11496
Filed: April 14, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Detroit Office
County: Wayne
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Hluchaniuk
Presiding Judge: Lawrence P. Zatkoff
Nature of Suit: Employment
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 130 OPINION and ORDER Granting Defendant's 117 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 93 OPINION and ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 90 Motion to Set Aside Protective Order. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 78 OPINION and ORDER Granting Intervenor's 75 Motion to Substitute Party. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
June 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 74 OPINION and ORDER. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou)
March 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 14 OPINION and ORDER Granting In Part and Denying In Part Defendant's 8 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (Loury, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kheibari v. Rite Aid Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Kheibari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?