Frye v. CSX Transporation Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Jessica Frye
Defendant: CSX Transporation Incorporated, Consolidated Rail Corporation, Norfolk Southern Railway Company, Alan Gallacher and Ron Bedra
Case Number: 2:2014cv11996
Filed: May 19, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Detroit Office
County: Wayne
Presiding Judge: Mona K. Majzoub
Presiding Judge: Stephen J. Murphy
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 42:1396
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 107 OPINION and ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 102 Motion for New Trial. Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (DPar)
March 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 91 OPINION and ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part 49 MOTION in Limine Regarding Evidence of Prescriptions Depression or Suicidal Intentions, re 57 Order. Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (DPar)
September 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 OPINION and ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendants' 34 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (DPar)
May 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 20 Motion to Compel Discovery - Signed by Magistrate Judge Mona K. Majzoub. (LBar)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Frye v. CSX Transporation Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Frye
Represented By: Craig E. Hilborn
Represented By: Kevin C. Riddle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSX Transporation Incorporated
Represented By: Joseph J. McDonnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Consolidated Rail Corporation
Represented By: Joseph J. McDonnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Represented By: Joseph J. McDonnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan Gallacher
Represented By: Joseph J. McDonnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Bedra
Represented By: Joseph J. McDonnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?