Pittman v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Howard Pittman
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Trans Union, LLC, Equifax Information Services, LLC and Servis One, Inc. d/b/a BSI Financial Services
Case Number: 2:2014cv13591
Filed: September 16, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Detroit Office
County: Oakland
Presiding Judge: Paul J. Komives
Presiding Judge: Victoria A. Roberts
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER Granting 138 Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by District Judge Victoria A. Roberts. (LVer)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER Regarding 138 Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment and Setting Evidentiary Hearing. Evidentiary Hearing set for 2/24/2020 at 3:00 PM before District Judge Victoria A. Roberts. Signed by District Judge Victoria A. Roberts. (LVer)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER Denying 132 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by District Judge Victoria A. Roberts. (see image for deadlines and dates) (LVer)
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER (1) Granting Defendant BSI's Motion for Summary Judgment; (2) Deeming Moot BSI's Motion in Limine; and (3) Dismissing Case. 99 100 . Signed by District Judge Victoria A. Roberts. (LVer)
January 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER Regarding Defendant's Motion for Leave to File Motion for Summary Judgment and Suspending the Final Pretrial and Trial Dates Until Further Notice. Signed by District Judge Victoria A. Roberts. (LVer)
November 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER Denying 88 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment and Granting 90 Defendant iServe's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Victoria A. Roberts. (LVer)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pittman v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard Pittman
Represented By: Gary D. Nitzkin
Represented By: Travis Shackelford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Sidney L. Frank
Represented By: Tamara E. Fraser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union, LLC
Represented By: Brian A. Nettleingham
Represented By: Laura K. Rang - NOT SWORN
Represented By: Justin T. Walton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: Jordan S. Bolton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Servis One, Inc. d/b/a BSI Financial Services
Represented By: David M. Dell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?