Hubbell v. FEDEX Smartpost Inc.,
Plaintiff: Sheryl Hubbell
Defendant: FEDEX Smartpost Inc.
Case Number: 2:2014cv13897
Filed: October 8, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Detroit Office
County: Wayne
Presiding Judge: Paul J. Komives
Presiding Judge: George Caram Steeh
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:451
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER granting 101 plaintiff's Motion to review Costs (and costs of $10,062.78 are awarded to plaintiff) Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (MBea)
June 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER denying 95 plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (MBea)
March 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 92 OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part plaintiff's Motion for Entry of Judgment, Costs, Attorney's Fees and Interest 76 Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (MBea)
March 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER granting in part and denying in part defendant's Rule 50 Motion for Judgment as a matter of law and Rule 59 Motion for New Trial and/or remittitur 85 Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (MBea)
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER denying Motions in Limine 42 , 43 , 44 and 45 . Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (BRad)
January 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER permitting defendant's expert witness and reopening discovery. Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (MBea)
January 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 38 plaintiff's Motion in Limine to exclude witnesses. Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (MBea)
June 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 19 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 25 Motion to Strike. Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (MBea)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hubbell v. FEDEX Smartpost Inc.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheryl Hubbell
Represented By: Raymond Guzall, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FEDEX Smartpost Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?