Greiner v. Charter County of Macomb, Michigan et al
Plaintiff: John P. Greiner
Defendant: AFSCME LOCAL893, Charter County of Macomb, Michigan, Macomb County Road Commission and Macomb County Department of Roads
Case Number: 2:2014cv13979
Filed: October 15, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Detroit Office
County: Macomb
Presiding Judge: Matthew F. Leitman
Presiding Judge: R. Steven Whalen
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER Dismissing Plaintiff's 158 MOTION for Reconsideration. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 158 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 155 Motion for Relief from Judgment. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
June 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER Denying Without Prejudice Plaintiff's 153 Motion to Correct the Record. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
March 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER Denying 151 Motion to Expand Record. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER Denying 149 Motion to Expand Record. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER Granting Defendant's 123 Motion for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's First Amendment Retaliation Claim. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
October 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 130 Motion for Stay of Proceedings. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
October 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 125 and 126 Motions for Reconsideration. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
October 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 118 , 119 , 121 and 122 Motions for Reconsideration. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
September 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER (1) Granting AFSCME's 90 Motion for Summary Judgment; (2) Denying Without Prejudice AFSCME's Request for Sanctions; (3) Granting in Part and Denying in Part Without Prejudice Macomb County's 89 Motion for Summary Judgment; and (4) Denying Plaintiff's 115 Motion for Reconsideration Regarding Audio Tapes. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
May 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER (1) Granting Plaintiff's 111 Motion for Leave to File Flash Drive in the Traditional Manner and (2) Denying Without Prejudice Plaintiff's 109 Motion Requesting the Court to Listen to Excluded Portions of the Depositions in this Case and Rule on Including These Missing Parts into, or as Part of the Depositions and Part of the Record. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
April 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER Granting 100 and 101 MOTIONS for Extension of Time. (Response due by 4:30 p.m. on 4/14/2017, Reply due by 4:30 p.m. on 5/5/2017.) Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
March 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER Granting 91 Motion to Withdraw and Addressing Plaintiff's 98 Requests for Relief. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
February 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER to Appear for Hearing on Plaintiff's Counsel's 91 Emergency MOTION for Withdrawal of Attorney. (Motion Hearing set for 3/1/2017 at 2:00 PM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman.) Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
March 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER Granting Defendant's 71 Motion to Compel Deposition of Plaintiff. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
July 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER Granting Defendant's 38 Motion for a More Definite Statement. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
March 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Dismissing Defendant AFSCME LOCAL893. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (Monda, H)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Greiner v. Charter County of Macomb, Michigan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John P. Greiner
Represented By: Leland T. Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AFSCME LOCAL893
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charter County of Macomb, Michigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Macomb County Road Commission
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Macomb County Department of Roads
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?