Davis et al v. Detroit, City of et al
Plaintiff: Timothy Davis and Hatema Davis
Defendant: Detroit, City of, Charles Flanagan, Officer Novak, James Napier, John Doe and John Doe 2
Case Number: 2:2015cv10547
Filed: February 11, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Detroit Office
County: St. Clair
Presiding Judge: Paul D. Borman
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 168 OPINION AND ORDER overruling plaintiff's objections, adopting 165 Report and Recommendation and denying 88 Motion for class certification.Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (DPer)
October 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER Adopting 139 Report and Recommendation Denying 115 Motion for Default Judgment, filed by Hatema Davis, Timothy Davis. Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (DTof)
January 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 110 OPINION AND ORDER denying as moot 90 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (DTof)
January 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 107 OPINION AND ORDER Reluctantly Granting 105 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by Detroit, City of AND SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE. ( Status Conference set for 1/20/2017 02:30 PM before District Judge Paul D. Borman), MOTIONS WILL NOT BE HEARD ON THAT DATE, ALL COUNSEL MUST APPEAR. Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (DTof)
October 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 101 OPINION AND ORDER Adopting 99 Report and Recommendation Granting in Part and Denying in Part 65 Motion for Default Judgment, filed by Hatema Davis, Timothy Davis. Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (DTof)
July 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 89 OPINION AND ORDER Denying Objections contained in 78 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision, filed by Brian Johnson, James Napier, Stephen Geelhood, Charles Flanagan, Arthur Leavells, Steven Riley, Vatasha K Napier, Amy Matellic. Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (DTof)
March 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 54 Motion for Order to Show Cause. Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (DTof)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis et al v. Detroit, City of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Detroit, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Flanagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Novak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Napier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Davis
Represented By: Michael R. Dezsi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hatema Davis
Represented By: Michael R. Dezsi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?