Bailey v. Oakwood Healthcare, Inc. d/b/a Oakwood Hospital & Medical Center
Plaintiff: Michelle H Bailey
Defendant: Oakwood Healthcare Inc.
Case Number: 2:2015cv11799
Filed: May 19, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Detroit Office
County: Oakland
Presiding Judge: Paul D. Borman
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth A. Stafford
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 OPINION AND ORDER granting 38 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (DTof)
June 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 68 OPINION AND ORDER DENYING 59 MOTION for Leave to File Corrected Declaration and to Correct Summary Judgment Record filed by Michelle H Bailey. Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings as to 38 MOTION for Summary Judgment :( Motion Hearing set for 6/19/2017 03:00 PM before District Judge Paul D. Borman) Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (DTof)
April 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER denying 58 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (DTof)
February 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 OPINION AND ORDER granting 48 Motion to Strike Attorney-Client Privileged Communication. Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (DTof)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bailey v. Oakwood Healthcare, Inc. d/b/a Oakwood Hospital & Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle H Bailey
Represented By: Gerald D. Wahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oakwood Healthcare Inc.
Represented By: Rebecca S. Davies
Represented By: John P. Hancock, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?