Bennett v. MDOC et al
Plaintiff: Carl Bennett
Defendant: MDOC, Jackson Allegiance Hospital and John Doe
Case Number: 2:2015cv14465
Filed: December 24, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Detroit Office
County: Grand Traverse
Presiding Judge: Matthew F. Leitman
Presiding Judge: R. Steven Whalen
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part 127 Motion for Summary Judgment by the Corizon Defendants. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER Granting the Michigan Department of Corrections' 165 Motion for Reconsideration and Granting Summary Judgment in Favor of the MDOC on Count I of Plaintiff's Fourth Amended Complaint. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendants' 129 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER (1) Granting Plaintiff's 153 Motion to File Supplemental Brief and (2) Granting Defendants' Leave to File a Response to Plaintiff's Supplemental Brief. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Request for Additional Discovery re 135 Order. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER Regarding Status Conference. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 114 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER Regarding Individual Defendants' Addresses. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER Granting 103 Second Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER Denying 96 Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFF'S 90 Motion to Compel - Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (CCie)
April 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER to Attend Scheduling Conference and Notice of Requirements for Submission of Discovery Plan. (Scheduling Conference set for 5/9/2018 at 1:30 PM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. **PLEASE SEE ORDER FOR IMPORTANT DEADLINE**) Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
March 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER granting 63 Motion for reconsideration and denying 37 Motion to dismiss. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (DPer)
December 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER (1) Granting Defendant Jackson Allegiance Hospital's 38 Motion to Dismiss and (2) Dismissing Plaintiff's Claims Against Defendant Jackson Allegiance Hospital With Prejudice. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
September 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER (1) Overruling 52 Objections to 50 Report and Recommendation, (2) Adopting the 50 Report and Recommendation as the Opinion of the Court, (3) Granting Defendant Michigan Department of Corrections' 37 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, and (4) Dismissing Claims Against Defendant Michigan Department of Corrections Without Prejudice. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
January 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER (1) Denying Jackson Allegiance Hospital's 18 Motion to Dismiss and (2) Denying Michigan Department of Corrections' 27 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
December 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S 28 Motion to Amend/Correct Complaint - Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (CCie)
September 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S 17 Motion to Stay - Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (CCie)
May 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S 9 Motion to Appoint Counsel - Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (CCie)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bennett v. MDOC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MDOC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackson Allegiance Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?