Emmet v. Del Franco et al
Plaintiff: Peter W. Emmet
Defendant: Tom Del Franco, John Osendorf, Nicholas Del Franco, Martin Karo, Organic America, Organic America Supply, Organic America Farms, LLC, Hydroponics House, LLC, Organic America Holdings, LLC, Organic America Wholesale, LLC, Organic America Of Fort Myers, LLC, The Homestead Greenhouse Leasing Company, LLC, NDF Enterprises, D&G Green Enterprises, LLC, Mad Hatter Nutrients And Soils, Homestead Hydro, Organic America Farms Of Amherst, LLC, John Doe's 1-10 and ABC CORPORATIONS 1-10
Case Number: 2:2016cv11211
Filed: April 4, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Detroit Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Stephanie Dawkins Davis
Presiding Judge: Gershwin A. Drain
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT KAROS MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION [#91]. Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (TBan)
February 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS THE AMENDED COMPLAINT [#40] AND AMENDING SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (TBan)
August 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 OPINION and ORDER Denying 18 MOTION to Dismiss without Prejudice. Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (TMcg)
April 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MEMORANDUM OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 3/31/2016. (mmh) [Transferred from njd on 4/4/2016.]
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Emmet v. Del Franco et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter W. Emmet
Represented By: Kevin M. Mulvaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Del Franco
Represented By: Jeffrey Alan Crapko
Represented By: Gerald J. Gleeson, II
Represented By: Martin H. Karo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Osendorf
Represented By: Jeffrey Alan Crapko
Represented By: Gerald J. Gleeson, II
Represented By: Martin H. Karo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas Del Franco
Represented By: Jeffrey Alan Crapko
Represented By: Gerald J. Gleeson, II
Represented By: Martin H. Karo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin Karo
Represented By: Jeffrey Alan Crapko
Represented By: Gerald J. Gleeson, II
Represented By: Martin H. Karo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Organic America
Represented By: Jeffrey Alan Crapko
Represented By: Gerald J. Gleeson, II
Represented By: Martin H. Karo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Organic America Supply
Represented By: Jeffrey Alan Crapko
Represented By: Gerald J. Gleeson, II
Represented By: Martin H. Karo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Organic America Farms, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey Alan Crapko
Represented By: Gerald J. Gleeson, II
Represented By: Martin H. Karo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hydroponics House, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey Alan Crapko
Represented By: Gerald J. Gleeson, II
Represented By: Martin H. Karo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Organic America Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey Alan Crapko
Represented By: Gerald J. Gleeson, II
Represented By: Martin H. Karo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Organic America Wholesale, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey Alan Crapko
Represented By: Gerald J. Gleeson, II
Represented By: Martin H. Karo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Organic America Of Fort Myers, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey Alan Crapko
Represented By: Gerald J. Gleeson, II
Represented By: Martin H. Karo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Homestead Greenhouse Leasing Company, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey Alan Crapko
Represented By: Gerald J. Gleeson, II
Represented By: Martin H. Karo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NDF Enterprises
Represented By: Jeffrey Alan Crapko
Represented By: Gerald J. Gleeson, II
Represented By: Martin H. Karo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D&G Green Enterprises, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey Alan Crapko
Represented By: Gerald J. Gleeson, II
Represented By: Martin H. Karo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mad Hatter Nutrients And Soils
Represented By: Jeffrey Alan Crapko
Represented By: Gerald J. Gleeson, II
Represented By: Martin H. Karo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Homestead Hydro
Represented By: Jeffrey Alan Crapko
Represented By: Gerald J. Gleeson, II
Represented By: Martin H. Karo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Organic America Farms Of Amherst, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey Alan Crapko
Represented By: Gerald J. Gleeson, II
Represented By: Martin H. Karo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe's 1-10
Represented By: Jeffrey Alan Crapko
Represented By: Gerald J. Gleeson, II
Represented By: Martin H. Karo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CORPORATIONS 1-10
Represented By: Jeffrey Alan Crapko
Represented By: Gerald J. Gleeson, II
Represented By: Martin H. Karo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?