Synergen Inc. v. FCA US LLC
Plaintiff: Synergen Inc.
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Counter_claimant: FCA US LLC
Counter_defendant: Synergen Inc.
Thirdparty_plaintiff: FCA US LLC
Thirdparty_defendant: Uusi LLC
Case Number: 2:2016cv11842
Filed: May 24, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Detroit Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Nancy G. Edmunds
Presiding Judge: R. Steven Whalen
Nature of Suit: Recovery of Overpayment and Enforcement of Judgment
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 132 OPINION AND ORDER Denying Defendant's 114 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
March 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendant's 89 Motion to Enforce Court Order. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
November 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER Granting (1) Defendant's 86 Motion to Adopt Special Master's Report and Recommendation and (2) Plaintiff's Counsel's 88 Amended Motion for Withdrawal of Attorney. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
August 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER Granting (1) Defendant's 79 Motion to Adopt 78 Special Discovery Master's First Rule 53 Report and Recommendation Regarding Certain Discovery Disputes and (2) Defendant's 82 Motion to Adopt 81 Special Discovery Master's Second Rule 53 Report and Recommendation Regarding Certain Discovery Disputes. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
March 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER on Status Conference. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Synergen Inc. v. FCA US LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Synergen Inc.
Represented By: Kenneth B. Morgan
Represented By: Eric D. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Represented By: Laura Baucus
Represented By: Elisa J. Lintemuth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: FCA US LLC
Represented By: Laura Baucus
Represented By: Elisa J. Lintemuth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Synergen Inc.
Represented By: Kenneth B. Morgan
Represented By: Eric D. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_plaintiff: FCA US LLC
Represented By: Laura Baucus
Represented By: Elisa J. Lintemuth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_defendant: Uusi LLC
Represented By: Krista A. Jackson
Represented By: Sean P. McNally
Represented By: Kevin J. O'Dowd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?