FCA US LLC v. Cummins, Inc.
Plaintiff: FCA US LLC
Defendant: Cummins, Inc., Johnson Matthew Inc. and Johnson Matthey Inc.
Case Number: 2:2016cv12883
Filed: August 5, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Detroit Office
County: Oakland
Presiding Judge: Avern Cohn
Referring Judge: Stephanie Dawkins Davis
2 Judge: Stephanie Dawkins DavisM
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1330
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 105 STIPULATED ORDER DISMISSING CASE Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (MVer)
January 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER GRANTING JOHNSON MATTHEY, INC.S UNOPPOSED MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL PORTIONS OF ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AGAINST PLAINTIFF FCA US LLC. Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (MVer)
January 18, 2018 Filing 103 MOTION to Seal Portions of Its Motion for Summary Judgment Against Plaintiff FCA US LLC by Johnson Matthey Inc.. (Abel, Jason)
January 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER GRANTING CUMMINS INC.S MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL PORTIONS OF ITS MOTION FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE, BRIEF IN SUPPORT, AND ATTACHMENTS THERETO. Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (MVer)
January 16, 2018 Filing 101 MOTION to Seal Portions of Its Motion For Settlement Conference, Brief in Support of the Motion and Attachments Thereto by Cummins, Inc.. (Soble, Jeffrey)
October 26, 2017 Filing 100 NOTICE of Appearance by John Murphy on behalf of Johnson Matthey Inc.. (Murphy, John)
October 24, 2017 Filing 99 NOTICE of Appearance by Gilbert S. Keteltas on behalf of Johnson Matthey Inc.. (Keteltas, Gilbert)
September 14, 2017 Filing 98 TRANSCRIPT of Telephonic Status Conference held on September 8, 2017. (Court Reporter/Transcriber: Sheri Ward, 313-234-2604) (Number of Pages: 9) The parties have 21 days to file with the court and Court Reporter/Transcriber a Redaction Request of this transcript. If no request is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 days. Redaction Request due 10/5/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/16/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/13/2017. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, the transcript is publicly available. (Ward, S)
September 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 97 AMENDED ORDER OF BIFURCATION AND STATYING PROCEEDINGS ON DAMAGES. Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (MVer)
September 8, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Avern Cohn: Telephonic Status Conference held on 9/8/2017 (Court Reporter: Sheri Ward) (MVer)
September 7, 2017 Filing 96 RESPONSE to #94 Joint MOTION FCA AND CUMMINS MOTION TO CONTINUE THE FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE TO PERMIT EXPEDITED ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION and Certificate of Service filed by Johnson Matthew Inc.. (Abel, Jason)
September 5, 2017 Filing 95 NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: Status Conference Re: Docket Entries 93 and 94 set for 9/8/2017 02:30 PM before District Judge Avern Cohn (MVer)
September 1, 2017 Filing 94 Joint MOTION FCA AND CUMMINS MOTION TO CONTINUE THE FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE TO PERMIT EXPEDITED ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION by Cummins, Inc.. (Soble, Jeffrey)
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER OF BIFURCATION AND STAYING PROCEEDINGS ON DAMAGES Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (MVer)
August 15, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Avern Cohn: Status Conference held on 8/15/2017 (MVer)
August 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER FOLLOWING STATUS CONFERENCE AND NOTICE TO APPEAR: Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/18/2018 10:00 AM before District Judge Avern Cohn (MVer)
July 28, 2017 Filing 91 ANSWER to #86 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim with Affirmative Defenses by FCA US LLC. (Baucus, Laura)
July 20, 2017 Filing 90 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Johnson Matthey Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Johnson Matthey PLC for Johnson Matthey Inc.. (Abel, Jason)
July 18, 2017 Filing 89 NOTICE TO APPEAR: Status Conference set for 8/15/2017 10:00 AM before District Judge Avern Cohn (MVer)
July 18, 2017 Filing 88 NOTICE of Appearance by Gabriel E. Bedoya on behalf of Johnson Matthey Inc.. (Bedoya, Gabriel)
July 17, 2017 Filing 87 ANSWER to Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Johnson Matthey Inc.. (Abel, Jason)
July 14, 2017 Filing 86 ANSWER to Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM filed by Cummins, Inc. against Cummins, Inc. by Cummins, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1- 2013 Warranty) (Loew, Lauren)
June 27, 2017 Filing 85 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. FCA US LLC served on 6/27/2017, answer due 7/18/2017. (Baucus, Laura)
June 26, 2017 Filing 84 SUMMONS Issued for *Johnson Matthey Inc.* (DAll)
June 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER to correct spelling of name of added party. Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (DPer)
June 23, 2017 Filing 82 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by FCA US LLC against Cummins, Inc., Johnson Matthew Inc.. NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Baucus, Laura)
June 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER Vacating #77 Order on Motion Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (MVer)
June 23, 2017 REQUEST for SUMMONS for Johnson Matthey Inc.. (Baucus, Laura)
June 22, 2017 Filing 80 STRICKEN 6/23/17 RESPONSE to #78 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint filed by Cummins, Inc.. (Loew, Lauren) (Main Document 80 replaced on 6/23/2017) (ATee). Modified on 6/23/2017 (ATee).
June 21, 2017 Filing 79 SEALED EXHIBIT E - Confidential Documents re #78 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by FCA US LLC. (Baucus, Laura)
June 21, 2017 Filing 78 STRICKEN 6/23/17 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by FCA US LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit A - Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff FCA US LLCs Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint, # 3 Exhibit B - Cummins Interrogatory Responses, # 4 Exhibit C - Cummins Responses to Requests for Admissions, # 5 Exhibit D - Cummins written Responses to Request for Production, # 6 Exhibit E - CONFIDENTIAL FILED UNDER SEAL, # 7 Exhibit F - Proposed First Amended Complaint) (Baucus, Laura) (Main Document 78 replaced on 6/23/2017) (ATee). Modified on 6/23/2017 (ATee). Modified on 6/23/2017 (ATee).
June 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER granting #76 Motion to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (MVer)
June 20, 2017 Filing 76 MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL PORTIONS OF ITS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT AND PORTIONS OF ITS AMENDED COMPLAINT CONTAINING INFORMATION DESIGNATED AS CONFIDENTIAL UNDER THE STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order) (Baucus, Laura)
May 31, 2017 Filing 75 WITNESS LIST WITNESS LIST by FCA US LLC (Baucus, Laura)
May 31, 2017 Filing 74 CUMMINS INC.S PRELIMINARY LAY WITNESS LIST WITNESS LIST by Cummins, Inc. (Loew, Lauren)
May 9, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Avern Cohn: Status Conference held on 5/9/2017 (Court Reporter: Sheri Ward) (MVer)
April 17, 2017 Filing 73 NOTICE of Appearance by Susan L. Poll Klaessy on behalf of Cummins, Inc.. (Poll Klaessy, Susan)
April 17, 2017 Filing 72 NOTICE of Appearance by Hannah B. Griffin on behalf of Cummins, Inc.. (Griffin, Hannah)
April 7, 2017 Filing 71 NOTICE TO APPEAR: Status Conference IS RESCHEDULED for 5/9/2017 11:00 AM before District Judge Avern Cohn (MVer)
April 7, 2017 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: Hearing on 4/13/2017 is Cancelled re #65 Notice to Appear (MVer)
March 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 70 DISCOVERY PROTOCOL ORDER re #69 Memorandum Opinion & Order. Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Document Continuation Appendix A, #3 Document Continuation Appendix B) (MVer)
March 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER REGARDING ELECTRONIC DISCOVERY DISPUTE Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (MVer)
March 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER EXTENDING SCHEDULING re #63 Order. Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (MVer)
March 27, 2017 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: Hearing on 3/30/2017 is Cancelled re #67 Notice to Appear (MVer)
March 24, 2017 Filing 67 NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: Status Conference set for 3/30/2017 02:00 PM before District Judge Avern Cohn (MVer)
March 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 66 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (MVer)
February 10, 2017 Filing 65 NOTICE TO APPEAR: Status Conference is RESCHEDULED for 4/13/2017 10:00 AM before District Judge Avern Cohn (MVer)
February 10, 2017 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: Hearing on 4/6/2017 is Cancelled (MVer)
February 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 STIPULATED ORDER ALLOWING WITHDRAW OF FCA US LLC'S CO-COUNSEL CLARK HILL PLC Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (MVer)
December 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 63 AMENDED JOINT RULE 26(f) DISCOVERY PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (MVer)
December 14, 2016 Filing 62 TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference held on December 12, 2016. (Court Reporter/Transcriber: Sheri Ward, www.transcriptorders.com) (Number of Pages: 12) The parties have 21 days to file with the court and Court Reporter/Transcriber a Redaction Request of this transcript. If no request is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 days. Redaction Request due 1/4/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/17/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/14/2017. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, the transcript is publicly available. (Ward, S)
December 12, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Avern Cohn: Status Conference held on 12/12/2016 (Court Reporter: Sheri Ward) (MVer)
December 5, 2016 Filing 61 NOTICE TO APPEAR: Status Conference set for 12/12/2016 10:00 AM before District Judge Avern Cohn (MVer)
December 1, 2016 Filing 59 SEALED Stipulation for Interim Recall and Cost Sharing Order by FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5) (Baucus, Laura)
December 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER GRANTING FCA US LLC AND CUMMINS INC.'S JOINT MOTION TO FILE STIPULATED ORDER UNDER SEAL. Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (MVer)
November 22, 2016 Filing 57 Joint MOTION for Order to File Stipulated Order Under Seal by FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order) (Baucus, Laura)
November 16, 2016 Filing 56 NOTICE of Joinder/Concurrence in by FCA US LLC Reliance on Jury Demand (Baucus, Laura)
November 8, 2016 Filing 55 ANSWER to Counterclaim with Affirmative Defenses by FCA US LLC. (Baucus, Laura)
November 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 54 STIPULATED ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE FOR FCA US LLC'S FIRST RESPONSIVE PLEADING TO CUMMINS INC.'S COUNTER-CLAIM Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (MVer)
October 25, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Sean F. Cox: Mediation held on 10/25/2016. Disposition: Parties to submit a stipulation to Judge Cohn by 10/28/2016. (Court Reporter: Marie Metcalf) (JMcC)
October 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 53 STIPULATED ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE FOR FCA US LLCS FIRST RESPONSIVE PLEADINGTO CUMMINS INC.S COUNTER-CLAIM Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (MVer)
October 17, 2016 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Mediation reset for 10/25/2016 at 09:00 AM before District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC)
October 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 52 CORRECTED AMENDED TRO EXTENSION ORDER (EXHIBITS NOW ATTACHED) re #51 Order. Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C (MVer)
October 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 51 AMENDED TRO EXTENSION ORDER. Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (MVer)
October 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 50 AMENDED ORDER Regarding Mediation. (Mediation set for 10/28/2016 at 09:00 AM before District Judge Sean F. Cox) Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC)
October 13, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Sean F. Cox: Telephonic Status Conference held on 10/13/2016. (JMcC)
October 12, 2016 Filing 49 NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: Status Conference set for 10/13/2016 10:00 AM before District Judge Sean F. Cox. **COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF shall initiate the call and contact the Court when all parties are present** (JMcC)
October 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 48 STIPULATED ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE FOR FCA US LLCS FIRST RESPONSIVE PLEADINGTO CUMMINS INC.S COUNTER-CLAIM Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (MVer)
October 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER Regarding 10/17/2016 Mediation. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC)
October 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER from U.S. Court of Appeals - Sixth Circuit re #26 Notice of Appeal filed by FCA US LLC [Appeal Case Number 16-2335] (Ahmed, N)
October 11, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Sean F. Cox: Continued Telephonic Status Conference held on 10/11/2016. (JMcC)
October 11, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Sean F. Cox: Telephonic Status Conference held on 10/11/2016. (CONTINUED TELEPHONIC Status Conference set for 10/11/2016 at 02:00 PM before District Judge Sean F. Cox) *****COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF shall initiate the call and contact the Court at 313-234-2650 when all parties are present** (JMcC)
October 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 45 TRO EXTENSION ORDER. Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (MVer)
October 7, 2016 Set Deadlines/Hearings: TELEPHONIC Status Conference set for 10/11/2016 at 10:00 AM before District Judge Sean F. Cox. *****COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF shall initiate the call and contact the Court at 313-234-2650 when all parties are present** Mediation set for 10/17/2016 at 09:00 AM before District Judge Sean F. Cox (JMcC)
October 6, 2016 Filing 44 TRANSCRIPT of Hearing on Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction held on 10/06/2016. (Court Reporter/Transcriber: Linda M. Cavanagh) (Number of Pages: 32) The parties have 21 days to file with the court and Court Reporter/Transcriber a Redaction Request of this transcript. If no request is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 days. Redaction Request due 10/27/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/7/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/4/2017. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, the transcript is publicly available. (Cavanagh, Linda)
October 6, 2016 Filing 43 NOTICE TO APPEAR: Status Conference as to Damages Phase set for 4/6/2017 10:00 AM before District Judge Avern Cohn (MVer)
October 6, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Avern Cohn: Motion Hearing held on 10/6/2016 re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Cummins, Inc. (Court Reporter: Linda Cavanagh) (MVer)
October 5, 2016 Filing 42 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Cummins, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - L. Baucus Letter to J. Soble, #3 Exhibit B - S. Mazure Email to B. Mormino, #4 Exhibit C - R. Wagner Letter and enclosure to A. Hebert, #5 Exhibit D -. Sardar Email to L. Werhly and R. Wagner) (Miller, Vanessa)
October 4, 2016 Filing 41 NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: Status Conference set for 10/5/2016 10:30 AM before District Judge Avern Cohn (MVer)
October 3, 2016 Filing 40 MEMORANDUM REGARDING HEARING Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (MVer)
September 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER from U.S. Court of Appeals - Sixth Circuit re #26 Notice of Appeal filed by FCA US LLC [Appeal Case Number 16-2335] (Ahmed, N)
September 29, 2016 Filing 38 TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference held on 09/29/2016. (Court Reporter/Transcriber: Sheri Ward, 313-965-4401) (Number of Pages: 38) The parties have 21 days to file with the court and Court Reporter/Transcriber a Redaction Request of this transcript. If no request is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 days. Redaction Request due 10/20/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/31/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/28/2016. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, the transcript is publicly available. (Ward, S)
September 29, 2016 Filing 37 NOTICE OF HEARING on #35 MOTION for Injunction Pending Appeal and/or Preliminary Injunction Hearing (See Docket Entry 36 for Additional Information) . Motion Hearing set for 10/6/2016 10:00 AM before District Judge Avern Cohn Motion Hearing set for 10/7/2016 10:00 AM before District Judge Avern Cohn (MVer)
September 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER FOLLOWING STATUS CONFERENCE SCHEDULING A HEARING AND BIFURCATING CLAIMS Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (MVer)
September 29, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Avern Cohn: Status Conference held on 9/29/2016 (Court Reporter: Sheri Ward) (MVer)
September 28, 2016 Filing 35 MOTION for Injunction Pending Appeal by Cummins, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - Hearing Transcript on Motion for TRO and Preliminary Injunction, 9/21/16, #3 Exhibit 2 - Hearing Transcript on Motion for TRO and Preliminary Injunction, 9/22/16, #4 Exhibit 3 - Hearing Transcript on Motion for TRO and Preliminary Injunction, 9/23/16, #5 Exhibit 4 - Braverman v. New Mexico case, #6 Exhibit 5 - Eberspaecher N. Am., Inc. v. Nelson Glob. Prods., Inc. case) (Miller, Vanessa)
September 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Surety BOND in the amount of $ 10,000,000.00 pursuant to Temporary Restraining Order - Approved by Judge Cohn (DTyl)
September 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER DENYING FCA'S MOTION TO STAY THE TRO ORDER Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (MVer)
September 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER FOR STATUS CONFERENCE Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (MVer)
September 26, 2016 Filing 31 COURT EXHIBIT B - RE: TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER (FCA DRAFT) (MVer)
September 26, 2016 Filing 30 COURT EXHIBIT A - RE: TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER (COURT DRAFT) (MVer)
September 23, 2016 Filing 29 TRANSCRIPT of Hearing on Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction - Volume 3 held on Friday, September 23, 2016. (Court Reporter/Transcriber: Sheri Ward, 313-965-4401) (Number of Pages: 26) The parties have 21 days to file with the court and Court Reporter/Transcriber a Redaction Request of this transcript. If no request is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 days. Redaction Request due 10/14/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/24/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/22/2016. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, the transcript is publicly available. (Ward, S)
September 23, 2016 Filing 28 TRANSCRIPT of Hearing on Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction held on Thursday, September 22, 2016. (Court Reporter/Transcriber: Sheri Ward, 313-965-4401) (Number of Pages: 24) The parties have 21 days to file with the court and Court Reporter/Transcriber a Redaction Request of this transcript. If no request is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 days. Redaction Request due 10/14/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/24/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/22/2016. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, the transcript is publicly available. (Ward, S)
September 23, 2016 Filing 27 Certificate of Service re #26 Notice of Appeal. (DWor)
September 23, 2016 Filing 26 NOTICE OF APPEAL by FCA US LLC re #24 Temporary Restraining Order. Receipt No: 0645-5884914 - Fee: $ 505 - Fee Status: Fee Paid. (Filipovich, Cynthia)
September 23, 2016 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Soble on behalf of Cummins, Inc.. (Soble, Jeffrey)
September 23, 2016 Filing 24 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER Signed by Presiding District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith for District Judge Avern Cohn. (MVer)
September 22, 2016 Filing 23 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re #16 Response to Motion, (re Court's Proposed Temporary Restraining Order) filed by FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Temporary Restraining Order) (Berg, John)
September 22, 2016 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren M. Loew on behalf of Cummins, Inc.. (Loew, Lauren)
September 22, 2016 Filing 21 SEALED Sealed Exhibits re #16 Response to Motion, by FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Cummins 2009 Term Sheet, #2 Exhibit B - Full-System Exhaust, #3 Exhibit C - Sample Purchase Orders, #4 Exhibit D - General Terms and Conditions, #5 Exhibit E - Indirect Materials, #6 Exhibit F - Engine Regulatory Compliance Agreement) (Berger, Jay)
September 22, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Avern Cohn: Status Conference held on 9/22/2016 (Court Reporter: Sheri Ward) (MVer)
September 21, 2016 Filing 20 OBJECTION to Cummins Inc.'s Proposed Temporary Restraining Order by FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - Transcript of Hearing on Motion for TRO and PI, #3 Exhibit 2 - Cummins' Proposed TRO) (Berg, John)
September 21, 2016 Filing 19 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Cummins, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Cummins' Draft Temporary Restraining Order) (Miller, Vanessa)
September 21, 2016 Filing 18 TRANSCRIPT of Hearing on Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction held on September 21, 2016. (Court Reporter/Transcriber: Sheri Ward, 313-965-4401) (Number of Pages: 38) The parties have 21 days to file with the court and Court Reporter/Transcriber a Redaction Request of this transcript. If no request is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 days. Redaction Request due 10/12/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/24/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/20/2016. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, the transcript is publicly available. (Ward, S)
September 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #15 Motion to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (MVer)
September 21, 2016 Filing 16 RESPONSE to #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - Mazur Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 - Defect Report, #4 Exhibit 3 - Williams Declaration, #5 Exhibit 4 - Roach Declaration, #6 Exhibit 5 - Thiele Declaration, #7 Exhibit 6 - Unpublished Cases) (Baucus, Laura)
September 21, 2016 Filing 15 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal by FCA US LLC. (Berger, Jay)
September 21, 2016 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul L. Nystrom on behalf of FCA US LLC. (Nystrom, Paul)
September 21, 2016 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by James P. Feeney on behalf of FCA US LLC. (Feeney, James)
September 21, 2016 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura Baucus on behalf of FCA US LLC. (Baucus, Laura)
September 21, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Avern Cohn: Motion Hearing held on 9/21/2016 re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Cummins, Inc. Disposition: Motion taken under advisement (Court Reporter: Sheri Ward) (MVer)
September 20, 2016 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by John E. Berg on behalf of FCA US LLC. (Berg, John)
September 20, 2016 Filing 10 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Cummins, Inc. (Miller, Vanessa)
September 20, 2016 Filing 9 ANSWER to #6 Answer to Complaint, Answer to Counterclaim,,,, , AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint #1 Complaint, #6 Answer to Complaint, Answer to Counterclaim,,,, with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM filed by Cummins, Inc. against FCA US LLC by Cummins, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 2013 Warranty) (Miller, Vanessa)
September 20, 2016 Filing 8 NOTICE OF HEARING on #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. Motion Hearing set for 9/21/2016 02:00 PM before District Judge Avern Cohn (MVer)
September 20, 2016 Filing 7 EXHIBIT 1, Corrected, re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Cummins, Inc. (Miller, Vanessa)
September 20, 2016 Filing 6 [STRICKEN] ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand , AMENDED, ANSWER to Counterclaim with Affirmative Defenses , COUNTERCLAIM filed by Cummins, Inc. against FCA US LLC by Cummins, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 2013 Warranty) (Miller, Vanessa) Modified on 9/20/2016 (DWor). [RE-FILED: SEE DOCKET ENTRY #9 ]
September 20, 2016 Filing 5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Cummins, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Temporary Restraining Order, #2 Exhibit B - Proposed Preliminary Injunction Order, #3 Index of Exhibits, #4 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Jeff W. Caldwell, #5 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Brian Mormino, #6 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Girish Janakiraman, #7 Exhibit 4 - Declaration of Richard S. Wagner, #8 Exhibit 5 - Declaration of Srikanth Padmanabhano) (Miller, Vanessa) Modified on 9/20/2016 (DWor). [SEE DOCKET ENTRY #7 FOR EXHIBIT 1]
September 20, 2016 Filing 4 [STRICKEN] ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand , Verified, COUNTERCLAIM filed by Cummins, Inc. against FCA US LLC by Cummins, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 2013 Warranty) (Miller, Vanessa) Modified on 9/20/2016 (DWor). [RE-FILED: SEE DOCKET ENTRY #9 ]
September 20, 2016 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Vanessa L. Miller on behalf of Cummins, Inc.. (Miller, Vanessa)
August 5, 2016 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Cummins, Inc.* (LHos)
August 5, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by FCA US LLC against Cummins, Inc. with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-5814632 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Berger, Jay)
August 5, 2016 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (LHos)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FCA US LLC v. Cummins, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cummins, Inc.
Represented By: Lauren M. Loew
Represented By: Vanessa L. Miller
Represented By: Hannah B. Griffin
Represented By: Jeffrey Soble
Represented By: Susan L. Poll Klaessy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson Matthew Inc.
Represented By: Jason R. Abel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson Matthey Inc.
Represented By: Gabriel E. Bedoya
Represented By: John Murphy
Represented By: Gilbert S. Keteltas
Represented By: Jason R. Abel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FCA US LLC
Represented By: John E. Berg
Represented By: James P. Feeney
Represented By: Cynthia M. Filipovich
Represented By: Paul L. Nystrom
Represented By: Jay M. Berger
Represented By: Laura Baucus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?