Ayoub

Appellant: Ted T Ayoub and Norton T Gappy
Appellee: FirstMerit Bank, Weltman Wienberg & Ries CO., LPA, RSA Design Group, LLC, Robert Szantner, Beier Howlett, PC, Joseph F Yamin, Stephen C. Cooper, Cohen, Lerner & Rabinovitz, P.C. and Lambert Leser, PC
Case Number: 2:2016cv13687
Filed: October 17, 2016
Court: Michigan Eastern District Court
Office: Detroit Office
County: Wayne
Presiding Judge: Matthew F. Leitman
Referring Judge: Anthony P. Patti
Nature of Suit: Appeal
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 20, 2017 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (1) Affirming the Bankruptcy Court's Order Granting Defendant's Motion for Sanctions; (2) Vacating the Bankruptcy Court's Order Establishing Nature and Amount of Sanctions Against Plaintiff Ted Ayoub and Plaintiff's Counsel Norton T. Gappy; and (3) Remanding for Further Proceedings. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
January 20, 2017 21 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER to Temporarily Unseal Bankruptcy Court Record. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
December 27, 2016 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (1) Granting in Part and Denying in Part Appellant's 5 Motion to Extend Time to File Brief on Appeal and Temporarily Unseal Bankruptcy Court Record and (2) Denying Appellees' 12 and 18 Motions to Dismiss Appeal. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
December 16, 2016 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to Attend Telephonic Status Conference. (TELEPHONIC Status Conference set for 12/21/2016 at 3:30 PM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. **PLEASE USE THE CALL-IN INFORMATION PROVIDED IN THIS ORDER**) Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ayoub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Ted T Ayoub
Represented By: Norton T. Gappy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Norton T Gappy
Represented By: Norton T. Gappy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: FirstMerit Bank
Represented By: Trent B. Collier
Represented By: Michael P. Herzoff
Represented By: Jon J. Lieberman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Weltman Wienberg & Ries CO., LPA
Represented By: Trent B. Collier
Represented By: Michael P. Herzoff
Represented By: Jon J. Lieberman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: RSA Design Group, LLC
Represented By: Trent B. Collier
Represented By: Joseph F. Yamin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Robert Szantner
Represented By: Trent B. Collier
Represented By: Joseph F. Yamin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Beier Howlett, PC
Represented By: Trent B. Collier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Joseph F Yamin
Represented By: Trent B. Collier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Stephen C. Cooper
Represented By: Samuel S. Herman
Represented By: Joshua A. Lerner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Cohen, Lerner & Rabinovitz, P.C.
Represented By: Samuel S. Herman
Represented By: Joshua A. Lerner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Lambert Leser, PC
Represented By: Trent B. Collier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?