UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. QUICKEN LOANS INC.
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Quicken Loans Inc.
Case Number: 2:2016cv14050
Filed: November 15, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Detroit Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Mark A. Goldsmith
Presiding Judge: R. Steven Whalen
Nature of Suit: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 396 OPINION & ORDER (1) Overruling Defendant's Blanket Objections to Unsealing Documents (Dkt. 370 ) and (2) Setting Procedure for Parties to Follow to Move to Maintain Documents Under Seal or Redacted. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (KSan)
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER Regarding Quicken's Motion to Compel (Dkt. 138 ), the Government's Motion to Compel (Dkt. 139 ), and Quicken's Motion for Protective Order (Dkt. 122 ).( Government's documents due by 9/20/2018 ) Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K)
April 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 97 OPINION & ORDER Denying (1) Defendant's Motion to Strike, In Part, Plaintiff's Loan Selection Findings (Dkt. 75 ) and (2) Defendant's Motion to Supplement its Motion to Strike (Dkt. 80 ). Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K)
November 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER Regarding Government's Motion to Quash Subpoena and for Protective Order Regarding the Deposition of the Former Secretary of the Department of Housing and Urban Development (Dkt. 69 ). Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K)
May 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER Granting In Part and Denying In Part Plaintiff's Motion to Compel (Dkt. 32 ) and Granting In Part and Denying In Part Defendant's Motion to Compel (Dkt. 33 ). Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K)
March 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 OPINION AND ORDER Granting In Part and Denying In Part Defendant Quicken Loans Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. 15 ). Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K)
November 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 11/14/16. (lcrbw1) [Transferred from dcd on 11/15/2016.]
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. QUICKEN LOANS INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Samuel Buffone
Represented By: Peter A. Caplan
Represented By: Daniel H. Fruchter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quicken Loans Inc.
Represented By: Thomas M. Hefferon
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Morganroth
Represented By: Sabrina M Rose-Smith
Represented By: William Kyle Tayman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?