Concrete Jungle, LLC et al v. ICON Commercial Lending, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Concrete Jungle, LLC and Great Expectations, LLC
Defendant: ICON Commercial Lending, Inc., Randall J. Farr and Brent Watson
Case Number: 2:2016cv14114
Filed: November 21, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Detroit Office
County: Livingston
Presiding Judge: Nancy G. Edmunds
Presiding Judge: Mona K. Majzoub
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Court hereby GRANTS IN PART and DENIES IN PART Defendants Motion to Dismiss (Dkt.# 20).Defendant Brent Watson is DISMISSED from this action.Plaintiffs shall arbitrate all claims against Defendant ICON Commercial Lending, Inc. in accordance with the p arties agreements to arbitrate. Judicial proceedings in this matter are STAYED until such arbitration has been completed, and this case is ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. This action may be reopened once any party provides the Court with notice that arbitration has been completed. Signed by District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds. (CBet)
August 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER Adopting Report and Recommendation 31 ; denying pltf's motion for default judgment and to strike answer 14 ; granting deft's Motion to Set Aside default 21 . Signed by District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds. (CBet)
April 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Requiring Defendant Icon Commercial Lending to Secure Counsel and Order for Randall J. Farr, ICON Commercial Lending, Inc., Brent Watson to Show Cause why the Answer Should Not be Stricken and Why a Default Judgment Should Not be Entered Against Them. (Show Cause Response due by 5/12/2017) - Signed by Magistrate Judge Mona K. Majzoub. (LBar)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Concrete Jungle, LLC et al v. ICON Commercial Lending, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ICON Commercial Lending, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randall J. Farr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brent Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Concrete Jungle, LLC
Represented By: Jonathan B. Frank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Great Expectations, LLC
Represented By: Jonathan B. Frank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?