Childers v. General Motors Company LLC
Plaintiff: Denise Childers
Defendant: General Motors Company LLC and General Motors LLC
Case Number: 2:2016cv14428
Filed: December 21, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Detroit Office
County: Wayne
Presiding Judge: Nancy G. Edmunds
Presiding Judge: Anthony P. Patti
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 144 OPINION and ORDER denying Defendant's 138 MOTION to Dismiss and for Protective Order. Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (JCur)
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 142 OPINION and ORDER denying Plaintiff's 136 Motion for Relief from Pre-Recusal Orders and ORDER dismissing Plaintiff's State-Law Claims in 20-20081 without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (JCur)
September 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER denying 123 Motion for Reconsideration; and denying 124 Motion for Leave to File to a Response - Signed by District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds. (LBar)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 88 Motion for Summary Judgment - Signed by District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds. (LBar)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER EXPEDITING BRIEFING SCHEDULE re: Plaintiff's 87 MOTION to Compel Defendant to Produce Documents Responsive to Plaintiff's Third Request for Production of Documents and Answers to Plaintiff's Fourth Set of Interrogatories filed by Denise Childers., ( Reply due by 11/27/2018, Resolved/Unresolved Issues due by 11/28/2018)--Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony P. Patti. (MWil) Modified on 11/19/2018 (MWil).
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiff's 73 Motion for Sanctions--Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony P. Patti. (MWil)
April 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 63 OPINION and ORDER Rejecting re 35 Order on Motion for Protective Order, and Denying 22 MOTION for Protective Order - Signed by District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds. (LBar) Modified on 4/16/2018 (LBar).
March 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 47 Motion to Compel--Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony P. Patti. (MWil)
October 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER STAYING 37 Order on Motion to Compel--Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony P. Patti. (MWil)
October 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER GRANTING in part and DENYING in part 26 Motion to Compel--Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony P. Patti. (MWil)
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER GRANTING Defendant's 22 Motion for Protective Order--Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony P. Patti. (MWil)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Childers v. General Motors Company LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Childers
Represented By: Mayer Morganroth
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Thomson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors Company LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors LLC
Represented By: Margaret C. Alli
Represented By: Gregory M. Krause
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?