Brown v. HSBC BANK USA, NA
Plaintiff: Roderick Brown
Defendant: HSBC BANK USA, NA
Case Number: 2:2017cv10163
Filed: January 18, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Detroit Office
County: Oakland
Presiding Judge: Sean F. Cox
Presiding Judge: Mona K. Majzoub
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER Adopting 149 Report and Recommendation for Granting 134 Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by Computershare USA, Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER Adopting 127 Report and Recommendation for Denying 104 Motion for Default Judgment and Denying 106 Motion for Order to Show Cause. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (MacKay, K)
May 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER Adopting 54 Report and Recommendation for Denying 39 Motion to Strike, filed by Roderick Brown. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC)
August 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Adopting 26 Report and Recommendation for Granting in Part and Denying in Part 9 Motion filed by HSBC BANK USA, NA, and Granting 21 Motion for Leave to File filed by Roderick Brown [E-Filer]. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. HSBC BANK USA, NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roderick Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC BANK USA, NA
Represented By: Shannon L. Deeby
Represented By: Jennifer K. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?