Batson v. Hoover et al
Plaintiff: Omar Batson
Defendant: Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy Hoover, Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy Lt. Broecker, Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy Sgt. Kennamer, Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy Sgt. Eckert, Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy N. Leonowicz, Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy M. Wing, Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy M. Holland, Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy M. Mendez, Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy J. Salyers, Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy W. Rogers, Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy F. Verhelst, Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy P. Burt, Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy A. Chene, Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy J. Shaw, Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy D. Berlanga, Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy P. Gillman, Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy T. Hunter, Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy Sgt. Preece, Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy N. Kirby, Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy Bouchard, Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy J. Walker, Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy Gould, Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy J. Macy, Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy Taylor, Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy M. Skinner, Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy Clayton, Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy Henry, Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy N. Rainwater, Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy Desisto, Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy Rebidas, Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy Morgan, Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy N. Brooks, Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy D. Smith, Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy F. Cobbin, Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy Sgt. Stemper, Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy Pascal, Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy J. Thomas, Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy M.Scott, Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy T. Winston, Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy Railing, Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy Brown, Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy Fuller, Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy McIntosh, Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy C.Smith, Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy C. Walker, Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy Honeycutt, Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy Beagle, Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy Frazier, Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy Lasky, Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy Krieger, Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy Mims, Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy Sanchez, Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy G. Howard, Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy R. Finn, Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy G. Zofchak, Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy L. Mercer, Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy M. Johnson, Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy R. Smith, Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy C. Sheroski, Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy S. Poole, Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy R. Mason, Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy Sgt. Marsh, Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy Watts, Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy T. Howard, Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy Bueche, Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy C. Scott, Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy J. Snow, Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy Manley, Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy C. Brock, Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy C. Boyd, Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy S. Banks, Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy J. McWilliams, Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy M. Zilinski, Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy A. Herzog, Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy J. Rice, Genesee County Jail Employee Dennis M. Lloyd, DO, Genesee County Jail Employee S. Warner, RN, Genesee County Jail Employee A. Rodgers, RN, Genesee County Jail Employee J. Bexton, LPN, Genesee County Jail Employee S. Stebbins, LPN, Genesee County Jail Employee L. Cool, RN, Genesee County Jail Employee Cheryl Wyms and Genesee County Jail Employee B. Keaton
Case Number: 2:2017cv12214
Filed: July 6, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Ann Arbor Office
County: Genesee
Presiding Judge: John Corbett O'Meara
Presiding Judge: R. Steven Whalen
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 85 Order Staying Proceedings Pending Appeal. Case stayed.. Signed by District Judge David M. Lawson. (NAhm)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 78 OPINION and ORDER signed by District Judge David M. Lawson Granting in Part and Denying in Part 47 MOTION for Summary Judgment, Granting 72 MOTION for Summary Judgment, Dismissing as Moot 44 MOTION to Amend/Correct; and Dismissing the Amended Complaint With Prejudice, except the First Claim for Relief as to defendants Kennamer and Leonowicz only. (Grimes, K.)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER dismissing claims against certain defendants and directing the Clerk of Court to correct the electronic docket. Signed by District Judge David M. Lawson. (DPer)
July 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S 39 Motion to Quash Subpoena and Motion for Protective Order - Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (CCie)
June 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 OPINION and ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' 24 MOTION to Amend/Correct 15 Amended Answer to Complaint - Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (CCie)
June 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' 22 Motion for IME and for Immediate Consideration - Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (CCie)
October 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting 5 Motion for More Definite Statement; Plaintiff's Amended Complaint due 12/18/2017, Signed by District Judge John Corbett O'Meara. (WBar)
July 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF PARTIAL DISMISSAL RE 1 Complaint,, filed by Omar Batson. Signed by District Judge John Corbett O'Meara. (WBar)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Batson v. Hoover et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy Hoover
Represented By: Barney R. Whitesman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy Lt. Broecker
Represented By: Barney R. Whitesman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy Sgt. Kennamer
Represented By: Barney R. Whitesman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy Sgt. Eckert
Represented By: Barney R. Whitesman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy N. Leonowicz
Represented By: Barney R. Whitesman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy M. Wing
Represented By: Barney R. Whitesman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy M. Holland
Represented By: Barney R. Whitesman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy M. Mendez
Represented By: Barney R. Whitesman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy J. Salyers
Represented By: Barney R. Whitesman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy W. Rogers
Represented By: Barney R. Whitesman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy F. Verhelst
Represented By: Barney R. Whitesman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy P. Burt
Represented By: Barney R. Whitesman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy A. Chene
Represented By: Barney R. Whitesman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy J. Shaw
Represented By: Barney R. Whitesman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy D. Berlanga
Represented By: Barney R. Whitesman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy P. Gillman
Represented By: Barney R. Whitesman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy T. Hunter
Represented By: Barney R. Whitesman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy Sgt. Preece
Represented By: Barney R. Whitesman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy N. Kirby
Represented By: Barney R. Whitesman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy Bouchard
Represented By: Barney R. Whitesman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy J. Walker
Represented By: Barney R. Whitesman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy Gould
Represented By: Barney R. Whitesman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy J. Macy
Represented By: Barney R. Whitesman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy Taylor
Represented By: Barney R. Whitesman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy M. Skinner
Represented By: Barney R. Whitesman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy Clayton
Represented By: Barney R. Whitesman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy Henry
Represented By: Barney R. Whitesman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy N. Rainwater
Represented By: Barney R. Whitesman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy Desisto
Represented By: Barney R. Whitesman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy Rebidas
Represented By: Barney R. Whitesman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy Morgan
Represented By: Barney R. Whitesman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy N. Brooks
Represented By: Barney R. Whitesman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy D. Smith
Represented By: Barney R. Whitesman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy F. Cobbin
Represented By: Barney R. Whitesman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy Sgt. Stemper
Represented By: Barney R. Whitesman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy Pascal
Represented By: Barney R. Whitesman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy J. Thomas
Represented By: Barney R. Whitesman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy M.Scott
Represented By: Barney R. Whitesman
Represented By: Barney R. Whitesman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy T. Winston
Represented By: Barney R. Whitesman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy Railing
Represented By: Barney R. Whitesman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy Brown
Represented By: Barney R. Whitesman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy Fuller
Represented By: Barney R. Whitesman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy McIntosh
Represented By: Barney R. Whitesman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy C.Smith
Represented By: Barney R. Whitesman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy C. Walker
Represented By: Barney R. Whitesman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy Honeycutt
Represented By: Barney R. Whitesman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy Beagle
Represented By: Barney R. Whitesman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy Frazier
Represented By: Barney R. Whitesman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy Lasky
Represented By: Barney R. Whitesman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy Krieger
Represented By: Barney R. Whitesman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy Mims
Represented By: Barney R. Whitesman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy Sanchez
Represented By: Barney R. Whitesman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy G. Howard
Represented By: Barney R. Whitesman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy R. Finn
Represented By: Barney R. Whitesman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy G. Zofchak
Represented By: Barney R. Whitesman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy L. Mercer
Represented By: Barney R. Whitesman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy M. Johnson
Represented By: Barney R. Whitesman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy R. Smith
Represented By: Barney R. Whitesman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy C. Sheroski
Represented By: Barney R. Whitesman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy S. Poole
Represented By: Barney R. Whitesman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy R. Mason
Represented By: Barney R. Whitesman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy Sgt. Marsh
Represented By: Barney R. Whitesman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy Watts
Represented By: Barney R. Whitesman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy T. Howard
Represented By: Barney R. Whitesman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy Bueche
Represented By: Barney R. Whitesman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy C. Scott
Represented By: Barney R. Whitesman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy J. Snow
Represented By: Barney R. Whitesman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy Manley
Represented By: Barney R. Whitesman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy C. Brock
Represented By: Barney R. Whitesman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy C. Boyd
Represented By: Barney R. Whitesman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy S. Banks
Represented By: Barney R. Whitesman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy J. McWilliams
Represented By: Barney R. Whitesman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy M. Zilinski
Represented By: Barney R. Whitesman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy A. Herzog
Represented By: Barney R. Whitesman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genesee County Sheriffs Deputy J. Rice
Represented By: Barney R. Whitesman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genesee County Jail Employee Dennis M. Lloyd, DO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genesee County Jail Employee S. Warner, RN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genesee County Jail Employee A. Rodgers, RN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genesee County Jail Employee J. Bexton, LPN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genesee County Jail Employee S. Stebbins, LPN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genesee County Jail Employee L. Cool, RN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genesee County Jail Employee Cheryl Wyms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genesee County Jail Employee B. Keaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Omar Batson
Represented By: Daniel G. Romano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?