Grimes v. DOE
Plaintiff: Monique Grimes
Defendant: JOHN DOE and Trooper Mark Bessner
Case Number: 2:2017cv12860
Filed: August 30, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Detroit Office
County: Wayne
Presiding Judge: Gershwin A. Drain
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth A. Stafford
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER DENYING IN PART AND FINDING MOOT IN PART DEFENDANTS MOTION TO STRIKE AND FOR OTHER CORRECTIVE ACTION [#69]. Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (TBan)
March 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY PRODUCED BY THE STATE OF MICHIGANAND THE MICHIGAN STATE POLICE. Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (TBan)
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO QUASH AND GRANTING IN PART MOTION TO STAY [#19] AND STAYING ACTION UNTIL DECEMBER 31, 2017 (TBan)
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER TO PRESERVE EVIDENCE 7 . Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (TBan)
October 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting plaintiff's Emergency Ex Parte Motion for Alternate Serviceof summons and amended complaint on Trooper Mark Bessner 8 Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (MBea)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grimes v. DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trooper Mark Bessner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monique Grimes
Represented By: Danielle Lynn Dezbor
Represented By: Geoffrey N. Fieger
Represented By: Gina U. Puzzuoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?