Rajapakse v. Credit Acceptance Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Samantha Rajapakse
Defendant: Credit Acceptance Corporation, Brett A. Roberts, Steven M. Jones, Kenneth S. Booth, Douglas W. Busk, Charles A. Pierce, Arthur Smith, John S. Soave, Daniel A. Ulatowski, Board of Credit Acceptance Corporation, Glenda Flanagan, Thomas N. Tryforus and Scott J. Vassauzzo
Case Number: 2:2017cv12970
Filed: September 8, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Flint Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Stephanie Dawkins Davis
Presiding Judge: Matthew F. Leitman
Nature of Suit: Commercial/ICC Rates/etc.
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 144 JUDGMENT. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER (1) Denying Plaintiff's 137 Motion to Stay and (2) Directing Plaintiff to Inform the Court if She Wishes to File Separate Objections to the 136 Report and Recommendation. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 9 , 12 , 55 , 86 and 115 Motions for Summary Judgment Without Prejudice and Permitting Plaintiff to Re-File the Single Motion for Summary Judgment Allowed Under the Local Rules. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
May 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER (1) Overruling Plaintiff's 58 Objections to Magistrate Judge's 57 Report and Recommendation, (2) Adopting Report and Recommendation's Recommended Disposition, and (3) Denying Plaintiff's 13 , 14 , 16 , 17 , 18 , 25 , 26 , 27 , and 28 MOTIONS for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon)
February 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER OVERRULING 22 Plaintiff's Objections to Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation, ADOPTING 21 Report and Recommendation's Recommended Disposition, and DENYING 19 Plaintiff's Motion for Ex Parte Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (AChu)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rajapakse v. Credit Acceptance Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samantha Rajapakse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Acceptance Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brett A. Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven M. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth S. Booth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas W. Busk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles A. Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John S. Soave
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel A. Ulatowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Credit Acceptance Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenda Flanagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas N. Tryforus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott J. Vassauzzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?