Sanford v. Detroit, City of et al
Plaintiff: Davontae Sanford
Defendant: Detroit, City of, Michael Russell and James Tolbert
Case Number: 2:2017cv13062
Filed: September 18, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Detroit Office
County: Wayne
Presiding Judge: David M. Lawson
Presiding Judge: R. Steven Whalen
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 394 OPINION AND ORDER Denying Motions in Limine 362 and 363 , and Granting 364 Motion in Limine. Signed by District Judge David M. Lawson. (SPin)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 393 OPINION AND ORDER Denying Defendants' 352 Motion to Extend Discovery and Granting Plaintiff's 338 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by District Judge David M. Lawson. (SPin)
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 385 OPINION AND ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' AND NON-PARTY CITY OF DETROIT'S 373 MOTION for Order Defendants and Non-Party City of Detroits Motion for Relief and/or Clarification and Request for a Protective Order Relating to Docket No. 171, 171 Memorandum Opinion & Order, Motions terminated: 373 MOTION for Order - Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (CCie)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 329 ORDER REGARDING DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS in Limine: Denying 179 , 180 , 182 ; Granting 183 ; Denying 185 , 187 , 190 , 193 ; Granting in Part and Denying in Part 194 ; Granting 195 ; Granting in Part and Denying in Part 197 ; Denying 198 ; Granting in Part and Denying in Part 201 ; Denying 203 and 204 . Signed by District Judge David M. Lawson. (SPin)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 310 OPINION AND ORDER on Defendants' Motions Challenging Plaintiff's Expert Witnesses (Denying 130 , 132 , and 134 Motions to Strike, and Granting in Part and Denying in Part 138 Motion to Strike). Signed by District Judge David M. Lawson. (SPin)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 309 CORRECTED OPINION AND ORDER re 307 Opinion and Order Denying Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge David M. Lawson. (SPin)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 307 OPINION AND ORDER Denying Defendants' 148 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge David M. Lawson. (SPin)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 298 OPINION AND ORDER Granting Plaintiff's Motions 135 , 137 , 140 to Exclude Various Defense Expert Witnesses. Signed by District Judge David M. Lawson. (SPin)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 171 OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFF'S 39 MOTION To Compel Production of Documents Relevant to Plaintiff's Monell Claim, As Well As the Individual Defendants' Personnel Files, Disciplinary Records, Training Records, and Handwritten Notes - Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (CCie)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 142 OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 36 Motion to dismiss. Signed by District Judge David M. Lawson. (DPer)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanford v. Detroit, City of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Detroit, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Tolbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Davontae Sanford
Represented By: William H. Goodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?