Toma v. The Huntington National Bank
Plaintiff: Amar Toma
Defendant: The Huntington National Bank
Case Number: 2:2017cv13179
Filed: September 28, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Bernard A Friedman
Referring Judge: John Corbett O'Meara
2 Judge: Anthony P Patti
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER from U.S. Court of Appeals - Sixth Circuit re #39 Notice of Appeal filed by Amar Toma [Appeal Case Number 19-1355] (DWor)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER from U.S. Court of Appeals - Sixth Circuit re #39 Notice of Appeal filed by Amar Toma [Appeal Case Number 19-1355] (SKra)
April 3, 2019 Filing 40 Certificate of Service re #39 Notice of Appeal. (DWor)
April 3, 2019 Filing 39 NOTICE OF APPEAL by Amar Toma re #36 Judgment. Receipt No: 0645-7181716 - Fee: $ 505 - Fee Status: Fee Paid. (Cohen, Steven)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER denying Plaintiff's #37 Motion for Reconsideration re #35 Opinion and Order - Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (JCur)
February 28, 2019 Filing 37 MOTION for Reconsideration re #35 Memorandum Opinion & Order by Amar Toma. (Summerville, T.L.)
February 14, 2019 Filing 36 JUDGMENT in favor of Defendant against Plaintiff. Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (JCur)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 OPINION and ORDER granting Defendant's #16 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (JCur)
February 14, 2019 Filing 34 Notice of Determination of Motion Without Oral Argument re #16 MOTION for Summary Judgment (JCur)
February 6, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE by Amar Toma of withdrawal of #26 MOTION to Quash . (Cohen, Steven)
February 1, 2019 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: Motion Hearing on 2/19/2019 is Cancelled re: #29 Notice of Hearing on Motion (MWil)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER Vacating #28 Order Referring Motion #26 to Magistrate Judge. Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (JCur)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 STIPULATED ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR RESPONSE, Deadlines/Hearings as to #26 MOTION to Quash :( Response due by 2/7/2019, Motion Hearing RESET TO 3/26/2019 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Anthony P. Patti)--Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony P. Patti. (MWil)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STIPULATED ORDER to extend and adjourn certain discovery and case management deadlines re #24 Scheduling Order. Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (JCur)
January 18, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE OF HEARING on #26 MOTION to Quash . Motion Hearing set for 2/19/2019 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Anthony P. Patti (MWil)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER REFERRING MOTION to Magistrate Judge Anthony P. Patti: #26 MOTION to Quash filed by Amar Toma. Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (JCur)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATED ORDER Regarding Defendant The Huntington National Bank's Responses To Plaintiff's First Set Of Interrogatories And First Requests For Production Of Documents. Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (JCur)
December 27, 2018 Filing 26 MOTION to Quash by Amar Toma. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits Exhibit 1) (Summerville, T.L.)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STIPULATED ORDER Regarding Plaintiff Amar Toma's Answers And Responses To Defendant The Huntington National Bank's Second Set Of Interrogatories And Second Set Of Request For Production Of Documents. Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (JCur)
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATED ORDER ADJOURNING SCHEDULING ORDER DATES: Discovery due by 4/26/2019; Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 5/24/2019; Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/20/2019 01:00 PM; Jury Trial set for 9/3/2019 09:00 AM before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (Refer to image for additional dates) (JCur)
October 16, 2018 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Jane D. Quasarano on behalf of The Huntington National Bank. (Quasarano, Jane)
July 25, 2018 Filing 22 WITNESS LIST by Amar Toma (Cohen, Steven)
July 25, 2018 Filing 21 Defendant's WITNESS LIST by The Huntington National Bank (Behrendt, John)
July 13, 2018 Filing 20 REPLY to Response re #16 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by The Huntington National Bank. (Behrendt, John)
June 29, 2018 Filing 19 RESPONSE to #16 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Amar Toma. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R) (Cohen, Steven)
June 18, 2018 Filing 18 Notice of Determination of Motion Without Oral Argument re #16 MOTION for Summary Judgment (JCur)
June 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER to Extend Time to File Response to #16 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by The Huntington National Bank. Response due by 6/29/2018. Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (JCur)
May 18, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION for Summary Judgment by The Huntington National Bank. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit A, #14 Exhibit B) (Behrendt, John)
May 18, 2018 Filing 15 ANSWER to #14 Amended Complaint, by The Huntington National Bank. (Behrendt, John)
May 4, 2018 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Amar Toma against Amar Toma. NO NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O) (Cohen, Steven) Modified on 5/4/2018 (DWor). [DOCUMENT FILED AGAINST DEFENDANT]
April 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 2/25/2019; Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 3/25/2019; Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/25/2019 01:00 PM; Jury Trial set for 7/2/2019 09:00 AM before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (Refer to image for additional dates) (JCur)
April 25, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 4/25/2018 (Court Reporter: Suzanne Jacques) (JCur)
April 23, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 4/25/2018 11:45 AM before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. The court will initiate the call. (JCur)
March 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying Plaintiff's #5 Motion to Remand. Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (JCur)
March 7, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman: Motion Hearing held on 3/7/2018 re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Amar Toma. Disposition: Motion denied (Court Reporter: Darlene May) (JCur)
February 7, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE OF MOTION HEARING TO BE HELD AT WAYNE STATE UNIVERSITY LAW SCHOOL on #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court. Motion Hearing set for 3/7/2018 09:00 AM before District Judge Bernard A. Friedman (Refer to image for additional details) (JCur)
January 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER of DISQUALIFICATION and REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge John Corbett O'Meara in Ann Arbor to District Judge Bernard A. Friedman in Detroit. (SSch)
January 22, 2018 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: Hearing on 2/1/18 is Cancelled re #6 Notice of Hearing on Motion (WBar)
November 13, 2017 Filing 8 REPLY to Response re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Amar Toma. (Summerville, T.L.)
November 6, 2017 Filing 7 RESPONSE to #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by The Huntington National Bank. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Declaration of J. Adam Behrendt, #3 Exhibit A-1 - 9/15/2017 (2:15 pm) e-mail with attachment, #4 Exhibit A-2 - 9/15/2017 (3:12 pm) e-mail, #5 Exhibit A-3 - 9/15/2017 (3:43 pm) e-mail, #6 Exhibit A-4 - 9/14/2017 State Court Scheduling Order, #7 Exhibit A-5 - 9/19/2017 State Court Order, #8 Exhibit A-6 - 9/20/2017 e-mail (10:53 am), #9 Exhibit B - State Court Joint Case Management Order, #10 Exhibit C - Plaintiff's Answer To Interrogatory No. 3) (Behrendt, John)
October 25, 2017 Filing 6 NOTICE OF HEARING on #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court. Motion Hearing set for 2/1/2018 10:00 AM before District Judge John Corbett O'Meara (WBar)
October 23, 2017 Filing 5 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Amar Toma. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit) (Summerville, T.L.)
October 23, 2017 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by T.L. Summerville on behalf of Amar Toma. (Summerville, T.L.)
October 20, 2017 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Z. Cohen on behalf of Amar Toma. (Cohen, Steven)
October 3, 2017 Filing 2 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by The Huntington National Bank identifying Corporate Parent Huntington Bancshares Incorporated for The Huntington National Bank. (Behrendt, John)
September 28, 2017 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (Ahmed, N)
September 28, 2017 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The Huntington National Bank from Oakland County Circuit Court, case number 17-159528-CB. Receipt No: 0645-6417354 - Fee: $ 400 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Proof of Amount in Controversy, #2 Exhibit B-Pleadings from State Court, #3 Document Continuation Proof of Service by Mail) (Behrendt, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Toma v. The Huntington National Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amar Toma
Represented By: Steven Z. Cohen
Represented By: T.L. Summerville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Huntington National Bank
Represented By: John A. Behrendt
Represented By: Jane D. Quasarano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?