McCloskey et al v. FCA US LLC
Plaintiff: Mark McCloskey and Michele McCloskey
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Case Number: 2:2017cv13840
Filed: November 30, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Detroit Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Referring Judge: David M Lawson
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER DISMISSING CASE Signed by District Judge David M. Lawson. (SSch)
April 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER of Attorney Withdrawal. Signed by District Judge David M. Lawson. (SSch)
March 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Granting Motion to Withdraw. Signed by District Judge David M. Lawson. (SSch)
March 2, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Fred J. Fresard on behalf of FCA US LLC. (Fresard, Fred)
March 2, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Brittany J. Mouzourakis on behalf of FCA US LLC. (Mouzourakis, Brittany)
March 2, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by James P. Feeney on behalf of FCA US LLC. (Feeney, James)
February 23, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Attorney Kathy A. Wisniewski for on behalf of FCA US LLC. (Wisniewski, Kathy)
December 15, 2017 Filing 7 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Cheryl A. Bush appearing on behalf of FCA US LLC (Bush, Cheryl)
December 15, 2017 Filing 6 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Michael R. Williams appearing on behalf of FCA US LLC (Williams, Michael)
December 8, 2017 Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Amanda J. Hettinger appearing on behalf of FCA US LLC (Hettinger, Amanda)
December 8, 2017 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Kathy A. Wisniewski appearing on behalf of FCA US LLC (Wisniewski, Kathy)
November 30, 2017 Filing 3 Docket Sheet from Ohio Southern; Case Number 2:17-cv-00999. Modified on 11/30/2017 (VLun).
November 30, 2017 Filing 2 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-13): Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the U.S. Judicial Panel on MDL, this case is transferred to the Eastern District of Michigan. Signed by the Clerk of the Panel Jeffrey N. Luthi on 11/28/2017, certified by the Clerk, USDC for the Eastern District of Michigan. (er) [Transferred from ohsd on 11/30/2017.]
November 30, 2017 Filing 1 TRANSFERREDNOTICE OF REMOVAL from Franklin County Common Pleas Court, case number 17CV009271 ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6206120), filed by FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A Complaint and Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet) (Dickerson, Denise) [Case transferred in from Ohio Southern; Case Number 2:17-cv-00999.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCloskey et al v. FCA US LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark McCloskey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michele McCloskey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Represented By: Denise A. Dickerson
Represented By: Kathy A. Wisniewski
Represented By: Amanda J. Hettinger
Represented By: Fred J. Fresard
Represented By: Brittany J. Mouzourakis
Represented By: Cheryl A. Bush
Represented By: Michael R. Williams
Represented By: James P. Feeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?