League of Women Voters of Michigan et al v. Johnson
Plaintiff: League of Women Voters of Michigan, Roger J. Brdak, Frederick C. Durhal, Jr., Jack E. Ellis, Donna E. Farris, William "Bill" J. Grasha, Rosa L. Holliday, Diana L. Ketola, Jon "Jack" G. LaSalle, Richard "Dick" W. Long, Lorenzo Rivera and Rashida H. Tlaib
Defendant: Ruth Johnson
Case Number: 2:2017cv14148
Filed: December 22, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Detroit Office
County: Ingham
Presiding Judge: Eric L. Clay
Referring Judge: Denise Page Hood
2 Judge: Gordon J. Quist
Nature of Suit: Voting
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 268 OPINION AND ORDER. Signed by Circuit Judge Eric L. Clay on behalf of the panel. (LSau)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 267 ORDER denying 252 , 253 Intervenors' Rule 52(C) Motions for Judgment on Partial Findings. Signed by District Judge Gordon J. Quist. (VLun)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 216 ORDER Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Determination of Privilege 149 & 150 . Signed by District Judge Gordon J. Quist. (LSau)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER Denying Secretary's Motions in Limine to Exclude the Expert Report of Dr. Jowell Chen 147 and to Exclude Testimony Concerning Gerrymandering Metrics 148 . Signed by District Judge Gordon J. Quist. (LSau)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER DENYING the Legislative Intervenors' Renewed 136 Motion to Intervene. Signed by Circuit Judge Eric L. Clay on behalf of the Panel. (Attachments: # 1 Dissent by Judge Quist) (Marion, Diane)
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER Granting in Part 111 The Congressional Intervenors Emergency Motion to Alter Case Management Order #1. Signed by Circuit Judge Eric L. Clay on behalf of the panel. (Marion, Diane)
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER Directing The Republican Congressional Delegation to Comply With Case Management Order No. 1 (D/E #53). Signed by Circuit Judge Eric L. Clay on behalf of the panel. (Marion, Diane)
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER granting in Part and Denying in Part 73 Defendant's Motion to Compel. Signed by Circuit Judge Eric L. Clay on behalf of the panel. (Marion, Diane)
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER Denying Motion to Intervene by Individual Michigan Legislators 70 . Signed by District Judge Gordon J. Quist. (LSau)
May 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Non-Party Movants' Motions to Quash 27 , 46 . Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (LSau)
May 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 OPINION AND ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Standing 11 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Circuit Judge Eric L. Clay on behalf of the panel. (Marion, Diane)
April 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO INTERVENE BY REPUBLICAN CONGRESSIONAL DELEGATION 21 Motion to Intervene. Signed by Circuit Judge Eric L. Clay on behalf of the panel. (Marion, Diane)
March 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER denying 11 Motion to Stay. Signed by Circuit Judge Eric L. Clay on behalf of the panel. (Marion, Diane)
December 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Granting 5 Application for Three-Judge Court. Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (JOwe)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: League of Women Voters of Michigan et al v. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: League of Women Voters of Michigan
Represented By: Mark C. Brewer
Represented By: Jeffrey P. Justman
Represented By: Harmony Mappes
Represented By: Joseph H. Yeager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger J. Brdak
Represented By: Mark C. Brewer
Represented By: Jeffrey P. Justman
Represented By: Harmony Mappes
Represented By: Joseph H. Yeager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frederick C. Durhal, Jr.
Represented By: Mark C. Brewer
Represented By: Jeffrey P. Justman
Represented By: Harmony Mappes
Represented By: Joseph H. Yeager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack E. Ellis
Represented By: Mark C. Brewer
Represented By: Jeffrey P. Justman
Represented By: Harmony Mappes
Represented By: Joseph H. Yeager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna E. Farris
Represented By: Mark C. Brewer
Represented By: Jeffrey P. Justman
Represented By: Harmony Mappes
Represented By: Joseph H. Yeager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William "Bill" J. Grasha
Represented By: Mark C. Brewer
Represented By: Jeffrey P. Justman
Represented By: Harmony Mappes
Represented By: Joseph H. Yeager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosa L. Holliday
Represented By: Mark C. Brewer
Represented By: Jeffrey P. Justman
Represented By: Harmony Mappes
Represented By: Joseph H. Yeager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diana L. Ketola
Represented By: Mark C. Brewer
Represented By: Jeffrey P. Justman
Represented By: Harmony Mappes
Represented By: Joseph H. Yeager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jon "Jack" G. LaSalle
Represented By: Mark C. Brewer
Represented By: Jeffrey P. Justman
Represented By: Harmony Mappes
Represented By: Joseph H. Yeager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard "Dick" W. Long
Represented By: Mark C. Brewer
Represented By: Jeffrey P. Justman
Represented By: Harmony Mappes
Represented By: Joseph H. Yeager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorenzo Rivera
Represented By: Mark C. Brewer
Represented By: Jeffrey P. Justman
Represented By: Harmony Mappes
Represented By: Joseph H. Yeager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rashida H. Tlaib
Represented By: Mark C. Brewer
Represented By: Jeffrey P. Justman
Represented By: Harmony Mappes
Represented By: Joseph H. Yeager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruth Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?