CRF Small Business Loan Company, LLC v. Eclipse Real Estate Holdings, LLC et al
Plaintiff: CRF Small Business Loan Company, LLC
Defendant: Eclipse Real Estate Holdings, LLC, Eclipse Community Investments, Inc. and William R Blackson
Case Number: 2:2018cv11999
Filed: June 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Detroit Office
County: Wayne
Presiding Judge: Stephanie Dawkins Davis
Referring Judge: Nancy G Edmunds
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Order Vacating #8 Order to Show Cause - Signed by District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds. (LBar)
August 8, 2018 Filing 15 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by CRF Small Business Loan Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8) (Cole, Michael)
August 6, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE TO APPEAR: Scheduling Conference re-set for 9/12/2018 @ 10:00 AM before District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds (LBar)
August 6, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE TO APPEAR: Scheduling Conference set for 8/21/2018 @ 10:00 AM before District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds (LBar)
August 3, 2018 Filing 12 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Eclipse Real Estate Holdings, LLC (Hart, Erika)
August 3, 2018 Filing 11 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Eclipse Community Investments, Inc. (Hart, Erika)
August 3, 2018 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by William R Blackson, Eclipse Community Investments, Inc., Eclipse Real Estate Holdings, LLC. (Hart, Erika)
August 3, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Erika D. Hart on behalf of William R Blackson, Eclipse Community Investments, Inc., Eclipse Real Estate Holdings, LLC. (Hart, Erika)
July 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER for CRF Small Business Loan Company, LLC to Show Cause why this case should not be dismissed for lack of federal jurisdiction, specifically the lack of complete diversity of parties as required by 28:1332(a) - Signed by District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds. (LBar)
July 2, 2018 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed.. (Cole, Michael)
July 2, 2018 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed.. (Cole, Michael)
July 2, 2018 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. CRF Small Business Loan Company, LLC served on 7/2/2018, answer due 7/23/2018. (Cole, Michael)
June 26, 2018 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DWor)
June 26, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued for *Eclipse Real Estate Holdings, LLC* (DWor)
June 26, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for *Eclipse Community Investments, Inc.* (DWor)
June 26, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *William R Blackson* (DWor)
June 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by CRF Small Business Loan Company, LLC against All Defendants. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-6791407 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Hennepin, MN - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit) (Cole, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CRF Small Business Loan Company, LLC v. Eclipse Real Estate Holdings, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eclipse Real Estate Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Erika D. Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eclipse Community Investments, Inc.
Represented By: Erika D. Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William R Blackson
Represented By: Erika D. Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CRF Small Business Loan Company, LLC
Represented By: Michael James Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?