Younce et al v. Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Indenture Trustee for New Century Home Equity Loan Trust 2005-3 et al
Plaintiff: Martin Younce and Theresa J. Younce
Defendant: Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC and Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Indenture Trustee for New Century Home Equity Loan Trust 2005-3
Case Number: 2:2018cv12215
Filed: July 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Office: Detroit Office
County: Washtenaw
Presiding Judge: Stephanie Dawkins Davis
Referring Judge: David M Lawson
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1444
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE OF HEARING on #10 MOTION to Set Aside Sheriff's Sale or in the Alternative Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and for Preliminary Injunction to Stay and Toll the Expiration of the Redemption Period. Motion Hearing set for 11/6/2018 at 2:00 PM before District Judge David M. Lawson. (SPin)
August 31, 2018 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Scheduling Conference reset for 11/6/2018 at 2:30 PM before District Judge David M. Lawson. Documents due 10/30/2018. (SPin)
August 31, 2018 Filing 13 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint in lieu of Answer by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits Index, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit) (Scodeller, Raymond)
August 30, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Raymond H. K. Scodeller on behalf of All Defendants. (Scodeller, Raymond)
August 30, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE TO APPEAR: Scheduling Conference set for 10/9/2018 at 9:00 AM before District Judge David M. Lawson. See image for document deadline. (SPin)
August 23, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION to Set Aside Sheriff's Sale or in the Alternative Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and for Preliminary Injunction to Stay and Toll the Expiration of the Redemption Period by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to 7) (Fair, Darwyn)
July 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer All Defendants; responsive pleading(s) due 8/31/2018. Signed by District Judge David M. Lawson. (DTof)
July 23, 2018 Filing 8 RESPONSE to #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fair, Darwyn)
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Setting Time to Respond to #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. Response due by 7/23/2018. Signed by District Judge David M. Lawson. (SPin)
July 17, 2018 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC, Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Indenture Trustee for New Century Home Equity Loan Trust 2005-3 (Skeltis, Marla)
July 17, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC, Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Indenture Trustee for New Century Home Equity Loan Trust 2005-3. (Skeltis, Marla)
July 16, 2018 Filing 4 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Carrington Mortgage Holdings, LLC for Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC. (Skeltis, Marla)
July 16, 2018 Filing 3 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Indenture Trustee for New Century Home Equity Loan Trust 2005-3 identifying Corporate Parent Deutsche Bank Holdings, Inc. for Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Indenture Trustee for New Century Home Equity Loan Trust 2005-3. (Skeltis, Marla)
July 16, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Marla A. Skeltis on behalf of Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC, Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Indenture Trustee for New Century Home Equity Loan Trust 2005-3. (Skeltis, Marla)
July 16, 2018 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DPer)
July 16, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC, Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Indenture Trustee for New Century Home Equity Loan Trust 2005-3 from Washtenaw County Circuit Court, case number 18-616-CH. Receipt No: 0645-6817327 - Fee: $ 400 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit A Lower Court Pleadings, #3 Exhibit B Northfield Township Assessment Information, #4 Exhibit C Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal) (Skeltis, Marla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Younce et al v. Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Indenture Trustee for New Century Home Equity Loan Trust 2005-3 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Younce
Represented By: Darwyn P. Fair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa J. Younce
Represented By: Darwyn P. Fair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC
Represented By: Marla A. Skeltis
Represented By: Raymond H. K. Scodeller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Indenture Trustee for New Century Home Equity Loan Trust 2005-3
Represented By: Marla A. Skeltis
Represented By: Raymond H. K. Scodeller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?