Securities and Exchange Commission v. Maccoll
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: John C Maccoll
Case Number: 2:2018cv12473
Filed: August 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
County: Oakland
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Referring Judge: Sean F Cox
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 12:22
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Judgment as to Defendant John C. Maccoll by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Stoltz, Richard)
September 18, 2018 Filing 6 CONSENT to Judgment of Defendant John C. Maccoll by Securities and Exchange Commission (Stoltz, Richard)
August 30, 2018 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. John C Maccoll served on 8/29/2018, answer due 9/19/2018. (Stoltz, Richard)
August 9, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard G. Stoltz on behalf of Securities and Exchange Commission. (Stoltz, Richard)
August 9, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for *John C Maccoll* (NAhm)
August 9, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE by Securities and Exchange Commission Civil Cover Sheet (Stoltz, Richard)
August 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Securities and Exchange Commission against John C Maccoll with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. No Fee Required - US Government. County of 1st Plaintiff: USA - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Oakland. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Stoltz, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Securities and Exchange Commission v. Maccoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John C Maccoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Richard G. Stoltz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?