Campbell v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Darreis Campbell
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC, First Federal Credit Control, Inc., M&T Bank Corporation and Exeter Finance Corp.
Case Number: 2:2018cv12478
Filed: August 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
County: Wayne
Presiding Judge: Stephanie Dawkins Davis
Referring Judge: Laurie J Michelson
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Case Management Requirements and SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 12/17/2018, Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 1/31/2019, Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/13/2019 at 10:00 AM before District Judge Laurie J. Michelson and Jury Trial set for 5/20/2019 at 8:30 AM before District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (Refer to image for additional dates) (TMcg)
September 13, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Laurie J. Michelson: Scheduling Conference held on 9/13/2018 (Court Reporter: None Present, Not on the Record) (TMcg)
September 13, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Carl Schwartz on behalf of Darreis Campbell. (Schwartz, Carl)
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER of Dismissal of Claims Against Defendant First Federal Credit Control, Inc. re #15 Stipulation filed by First Federal Credit Control, Inc.., First Federal Credit Control, Inc. terminated. Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (TMcg)
September 12, 2018 Filing 15 STIPULATION Of Dismissal of First Federal Credit Control by First Federal Credit Control, Inc. (Gentry, Boyd)
September 10, 2018 Filing 14 DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Nitzkin, Gary)
August 30, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Darreis Campbell as to Exeter Finance Corp. (Nitzkin, Gary)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER to Attend Scheduling Conference and Notice of Requirements for Submission of Discovery Plan re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Exeter Finance Corp.., ( Scheduling Conference set for 9/13/2018 at 03:00 PM before District Judge Laurie J. Michelson). Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (TMcg)
August 24, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Darreis Campbell as to M&T Bank Corporation (Nitzkin, Gary)
August 17, 2018 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by First Federal Credit Control, Inc.. (Gentry, Boyd)
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Defendant Exeter Finance LLC's Extension to Respond to Complaint re #1 Notice of Removal, ( Response due by 8/30/2018). Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (TMcg)
August 15, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Misty L. Peterson on behalf of Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Peterson, Misty)
August 15, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Tameika Lavenia Montgomery on behalf of Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Montgomery, Tameika)
August 15, 2018 Filing 6 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Equifax Information Services, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Equifax Inc. for Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Bolton, Jordan)
August 15, 2018 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Bolton, Jordan)
August 10, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen W. King on behalf of Exeter Finance Corp.. (King, Stephen)
August 10, 2018 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SKra)
August 9, 2018 Filing 3 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Exeter Finance Corp. identifying Corporate Parent Enzo Parent, LLC for Exeter Finance Corp.. (Pilgrim, Jeffrey)
August 9, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey D. Pilgrim on behalf of Exeter Finance Corp.. (Pilgrim, Jeffrey)
August 9, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Exeter Finance Corp. from Third Judicial Circuit Court of Wayne County, case number 18-005412-CZ. Receipt No: 0645-6854210 - Fee: $ 400 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Pilgrim, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Campbell v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: Jordan S. Bolton
Represented By: Misty L. Peterson
Represented By: Tameika Lavenia Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Federal Credit Control, Inc.
Represented By: Boyd W. Gentry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M&T Bank Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exeter Finance Corp.
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Pilgrim
Represented By: Stephen W. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darreis Campbell
Represented By: Gary D. Nitzkin
Represented By: Carl Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?