Miller Johnson v. Ashkenazy Acquisition Corporation

Plaintiff: Miller Johnson
Defendant: Ashkenazy Acquisition Corporation
Case Number: 2:2018cv12515
Filed: August 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
County: Kent
Presiding Judge: Victoria A Roberts
Referring Judge: Elizabeth A Stafford
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2018 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Ashkenazy Acquisition Corporation served on 8/28/2018, answer due 9/18/2018. (O'Brien, Robert)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Deeming Satisfied re #5 Order to Show Cause Signed by District Judge Victoria A. Roberts. (CPin)
August 27, 2018 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Ashkenazy Acquisition Corporation served on 8/20/2018, answer due 9/10/2018. (O'Brien, Robert)
August 27, 2018 Filing 6 RESPONSE to #5 Order to Show Cause , RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Miller Johnson. (O'Brien, Robert)
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER to Show Cause Show Cause Response due by 8/28/2018. Signed by District Judge Victoria A. Roberts. (see image for details) (LVer)
August 14, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen James van Stempvoort on behalf of Miller Johnson. (van Stempvoort, Stephen)
August 14, 2018 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DWor)
August 14, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for *Ashkenazy Acquisition Corporation* (DWor)
August 14, 2018 Filing 2 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Miller Johnson (O'Brien, Robert)
August 14, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Miller Johnson against Ashkenazy Acquisition Corporation. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-6859132 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Kent County - County Where Action Arose: Oakland County - County of 1st Defendant: Out of State. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - Engagement Letters, #3 Exhibit 2 - Affidavit of Account Stated) (O'Brien, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller Johnson v. Ashkenazy Acquisition Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashkenazy Acquisition Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miller Johnson
Represented By: Stephen James van Stempvoort
Represented By: Robert W. O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?