TOLAPU v. Syntel, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: MAHESH VEER SATYA TOLAPU
Defendant: RAKESH KHANNA, PRASHANT RANADE, RAJESH MASHRUWALA, THOMAS DOEKE, ARITOSH CHOKSI, REX E SCHLAYBAUGH, JR, SETHI NEERJA, VINOD K SAHNEY, Syntel, Inc., Bharat Desai and GREEN MERGER SUB INC
Case Number: 2:2018cv12562
Filed: August 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
County: Wayne
Presiding Judge: Stephanie Dawkins Davis
Referring Judge: Stephen J Murphy
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by MAHESH VEER SATYA TOLAPU (DeLuca, Anthony)
September 4, 2018 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. ARITOSH CHOKSI waiver sent on 8/21/2018, answer due 10/22/2018; THOMAS DOEKE waiver sent on 8/21/2018, answer due 10/22/2018; Bharat Desai waiver sent on 8/21/2018, answer due 10/22/2018; RAKESH KHANNA waiver sent on 8/21/2018, answer due 10/22/2018; RAJESH MASHRUWALA waiver sent on 8/21/2018, answer due 10/22/2018; SETHI NEERJA waiver sent on 8/21/2018, answer due 10/22/2018; PRASHANT RANADE waiver sent on 8/21/2018, answer due 10/22/2018; VINOD K SAHNEY waiver sent on 8/21/2018, answer due 10/22/2018; REX E SCHLAYBAUGH, JR waiver sent on 8/21/2018, answer due 10/22/2018; Syntel, Inc. waiver sent on 8/21/2018, answer due 10/22/2018. (DeLuca, Anthony)
August 16, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (DWor)
August 16, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by MAHESH VEER SATYA TOLAPU against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-6863479 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Out of State - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Oakland. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): Oakland County Circuit Court, 2018-167788-CZ, Judge HALA JARBOU] (Attachments: #1 VERIFICATION OF PLAINTIFF) (DeLuca, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TOLAPU v. Syntel, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAKESH KHANNA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRASHANT RANADE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAJESH MASHRUWALA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMAS DOEKE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARITOSH CHOKSI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REX E SCHLAYBAUGH, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SETHI NEERJA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VINOD K SAHNEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Syntel, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bharat Desai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREEN MERGER SUB INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MAHESH VEER SATYA TOLAPU
Represented By: Anthony L. DeLuca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?