Weidman et al v. Ford Motor Company
Plaintiff: Paul Weidman, Teresa Perry, Perry Burton, Raul Valentin, Erica Gomez and Roy Naasz
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Case Number: 2:2018cv12719
Filed: August 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Stephanie Dawkins Davis
Referring Judge: Gershwin A Drain
2 Judge: Elizabeth A Stafford
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 15:2301
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATION AND ORDER Regarding Correcting Prior Order #22 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel, Attorney Mark P. Chalos for Perry Burton,Mark P. Chalos for Erica Gomez,Mark P. Chalos for Roy Naasz,Mark P. Chalos for Teresa Perry,Mark P. Chalos for Raul Valentin,Mark P. Chalos for Paul Weidman added. Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (TMcg)
October 24, 2018 Filing 23 Notice to Parties Regarding Consolidated Case: Order of consolidation entered on *10/24/2018*. Designated lead case number is *18-12719*. (TMcg)
October 24, 2018 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: Motion Hearing on 11/19/2018 is Cancelled re #17 Notice of Hearing on Motion, (TMcg)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Granting Plaintiffs' #14 Motion to Appointment of Interim Class Counsel. Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (TMcg)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATED ORDER Consolidating Cases and Extending Time for Defendant to File a Responsive Pleading (Plaintiff's to file Consolidated Complaint by 11/5/2018, Defendant's Responsive Pleading due by 12/4/2018 ) ***see order for additional dates*** Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (TMcg)
October 23, 2018 Filing 20 RESPONSE to #19 Notice (Other), Plaintiffs' Supplement to Plaintiffs' Motion for the Appointment of Interim Class Counsel by Ford Motor Company. (Douglas, Stephanie)
October 15, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs re #14 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Plaintiffs' Motion for the Appointment of Interim Class Counsel Plaintiffs' Supplement to Plantiffs' Motion for the Appointment of Interim Class Counsel (Dkt. No. 14) (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1- Mark P. Chaloss Experience and Qualifications, #3 Exhibit 2- Lieff Cabraser Firm Resume) (Miller, E.)
October 15, 2018 Filing 18 REPLY to Response re #14 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Plaintiffs' Motion for the Appointment of Interim Class Counsel filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Naasz Complaint) (Miller, E.)
October 12, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE OF HEARING on #14 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Plaintiffs' Motion for the Appointment of Interim Class Counsel. Motion Hearing set for 11/19/2018 at 10:00 AM before District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (TMcg)
October 8, 2018 Filing 16 RESPONSE to #14 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Plaintiffs' Motion for the Appointment of Interim Class Counsel filed by Ford Motor Company. (Douglas, Stephanie)
October 4, 2018 Filing 15 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Stephanie A. Douglas appearing on behalf of Ford Motor Company (Douglas, Stephanie)
September 25, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Plaintiffs' Motion for the Appointment of Interim Class Counsel by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - The Miller Law Firm, P.C. Firm Resume, #3 Exhibit 2 - Beasley, Allen, Crow, Methvin, Portis & Miles, P.C. Firm Resume, #4 Exhibit 3 - DiCello, Levitt & Casey LLC Firm Resume) (Miller, E.)
September 21, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Melvin B. Hollowell on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Hollowell, Melvin)
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATED ORDER Extending Time for Defendant to File a Responsive Pleading re #1 Complaint, ( Response due by 10/23/2018) Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (TMcg)
September 18, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam J. Levitt on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Levitt, Adam)
September 18, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel R Ferri on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Ferri, Daniel)
September 18, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by John E. Tangren on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Tangren, John)
September 18, 2018 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Ford Motor Company served on 9/7/2018, answer due 9/28/2018. (Miller, E.)
September 4, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by H. Clay Barnett, III on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Barnett, H.)
September 4, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis A. Lienhardt on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Lienhardt, Dennis)
September 4, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by W. Daniel Miles, III on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Miles, W.)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE from Magistrate Judge Stephanie Dawkins Davis to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford. (ATee)
August 31, 2018 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DWor)
August 31, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for *Ford Motor Company* (DWor)
August 30, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Sharon S. Almonrode on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Almonrode, Sharon)
August 30, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against Ford Motor Company with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-6885351 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: out of state - County Where Action Arose: out of state - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne County. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Miller, E.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weidman et al v. Ford Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Weidman
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Represented By: Adam J. Levitt
Represented By: Dennis A. Lienhardt
Represented By: Melvin B. Hollowell
Represented By: Daniel R Ferri
Represented By: John E. Tangren
Represented By: W. Daniel Miles, III
Represented By: H. Clay Barnett, III
Represented By: Mark P. Chalos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Perry
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Represented By: Adam J. Levitt
Represented By: Dennis A. Lienhardt
Represented By: Melvin B. Hollowell
Represented By: Daniel R Ferri
Represented By: John E. Tangren
Represented By: W. Daniel Miles, III
Represented By: H. Clay Barnett, III
Represented By: Mark P. Chalos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Perry Burton
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Represented By: Adam J. Levitt
Represented By: Dennis A. Lienhardt
Represented By: Melvin B. Hollowell
Represented By: Daniel R Ferri
Represented By: John E. Tangren
Represented By: W. Daniel Miles, III
Represented By: H. Clay Barnett, III
Represented By: Mark P. Chalos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raul Valentin
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Represented By: Adam J. Levitt
Represented By: Dennis A. Lienhardt
Represented By: Melvin B. Hollowell
Represented By: Daniel R Ferri
Represented By: John E. Tangren
Represented By: W. Daniel Miles, III
Represented By: H. Clay Barnett, III
Represented By: Mark P. Chalos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erica Gomez
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Represented By: Adam J. Levitt
Represented By: Dennis A. Lienhardt
Represented By: Melvin B. Hollowell
Represented By: Daniel R Ferri
Represented By: John E. Tangren
Represented By: W. Daniel Miles, III
Represented By: H. Clay Barnett, III
Represented By: Mark P. Chalos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy Naasz
Represented By: Dennis A. Lienhardt
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: W. Daniel Miles, III
Represented By: Adam J. Levitt
Represented By: Mark P. Chalos
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Stephanie A. Douglas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?