edwards v. McKessy et al

Plaintiff: florence edwards
Defendant: Gary McKessy, Deputy Kakowski, gregory conley, deputy stokes, Jackson County and gene scoby
Case Number: 2:2018cv12831
Filed: September 11, 2018
Court: Michigan Eastern District Court
0 Judge: David R. Grand
1 Judge: Bernard A Friedman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1343
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 4, 2018 9 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Jackson County, Deputy Kakowski, Gary McKessy, gregory conley, gene scoby. (Brege, Andrew)
September 24, 2018 8 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. gene scoby served on 9/14/2018, answer due 10/5/2018. (Dezbor, Danielle)
September 24, 2018 7 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Jackson County served on 9/14/2018, answer due 10/5/2018. (Dezbor, Danielle)
September 24, 2018 6 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. deputy stokes served on 9/14/2018, answer due 10/5/2018. (Dezbor, Danielle)
September 24, 2018 5 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. gregory conley served on 9/14/2018, answer due 10/5/2018. (Dezbor, Danielle)
September 24, 2018 4 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Deputy Kakowski served on 9/14/2018, answer due 10/5/2018. (Dezbor, Danielle)
September 24, 2018 3 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Gary McKessy served on 9/14/2018, answer due 10/5/2018. (Dezbor, Danielle)
September 12, 2018 2 SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (LGra)
September 12, 2018 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (LGra)
September 11, 2018 1 COMPLAINT filed by florence edwards against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-6899446 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Jackson - County Where Action Arose: Jackson - County of 1st Defendant: Jackson. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Dezbor, Danielle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: edwards v. McKessy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary McKessy
Represented By: Andrew J. Brege
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Kakowski
Represented By: Andrew J. Brege
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: gregory conley
Represented By: Andrew J. Brege
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: deputy stokes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackson County
Represented By: Andrew J. Brege
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: gene scoby
Represented By: Andrew J. Brege
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: florence edwards
Represented By: Danielle Lynn Dezbor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?