United States of America v. Currency $31,414 et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Currency $76,879.61 from JP Morgan Chase Bank Account No. 965840820, Currency $2,559.71 from JP Morgan Chase Bank Account No. 2974580629, Currency $885.07 from JP Morgan Chase Bank Account No. 786002154, Currency $93,636, Currency $35,982.64 from Bank of America Account No. 375014498799, Currency $34,241.73 from JP Morgan Chase Bank Account No. 136321690, Currency $35,021.47 from Bank of America Account No. 375014022505, Currency $20,196 from JP Morgan Chase Bank Account No. 830293010, Currency $5,790.08 from JP Morgan Chase Bank Account No. 807651591, Currency $521.77 from JP Morgan Chase Bank Account No. 2740498114, Currency $31,414, Currency $16,436.91 from Ameriprise Financial brokerage account #0000446753782133, Currency $1,794.29 from Ameriprise Financial IRA account #0000411251465133 and Currency $12,292.45 from Ameriprise Financial SEP IRA account #0000504843996133
Claimant: FARES YASIN, Nura Yasin, Michigan Home Visiting Physicians, yasin properties, detroit%20visiting, ahmed Yasin and Kelly Haynes-Yasin
Case Number: 2:2018cv12861
Filed: September 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Avern Cohn
Referring Judge: Stephanie Dawkins Davis
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1345
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2018 Filing 25 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Nineveh S. Korkis appearing on behalf of Kelly Haynes-Yasin (Korkis, Nineveh)
November 9, 2018 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #16 Warrant Issued, #17 Warrant Issued, #14 Amended Complaint, #15 Warrant Issued by United States of America (Ross, Philip)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Stipulated Order to Stay and Administratively Close Civil Forfeiture Proceeding Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (SSch)
October 29, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE by Nura Yasin of Claim of Interest (Raben, Margaret)
October 29, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret S. Raben on behalf of Nura Yasin. (Raben, Margaret)
October 24, 2018 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #16 Warrant Issued, #17 Warrant Issued, #14 Amended Complaint, #15 Warrant Issued by United States of America (Ross, Philip)
October 24, 2018 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #16 Warrant Issued, #17 Warrant Issued, #14 Amended Complaint, #15 Warrant Issued by United States of America (Ross, Philip)
October 24, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Mohammed Abdrabboh on behalf of FARES YASIN, detroit%20visiting, ahmed Yasin, Michigan Home Visiting Physicians, yasin properties. (Abdrabboh, Mohammed)
October 24, 2018 Filing 17 Warrant of Arrest and Notice In Rem Issued (DPer)
October 24, 2018 Filing 16 Warrant of Arrest and Notice In Rem Issued (DPer)
October 24, 2018 Filing 15 Warrant of Arrest and Notice In Rem Issued (DPer)
October 24, 2018 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by United States of America against All Defendants. NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Ross, Philip)
September 24, 2018 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #2 Warrant Issued, #8 Warrant Issued, #10 Warrant Issued, #9 Warrant Issued, #5 Warrant Issued, #11 Warrant Issued, #1 Complaint, #7 Warrant Issued, #3 Warrant Issued, #6 Warrant Issued, #4 Warrant Issued, #12 Warrant Issued by All Plaintiffs (Ross, Philip)
September 20, 2018 Filing 12 Warrant of Arrest and Notice In Rem Issued. (NAhm)
September 20, 2018 Filing 11 Warrant of Arrest and Notice In Rem Issued. (NAhm)
September 20, 2018 Filing 10 Warrant of Arrest and Notice In Rem Issued. (NAhm)
September 20, 2018 Filing 9 Warrant of Arrest and Notice In Rem Issued. (NAhm)
September 20, 2018 Filing 8 Warrant of Arrest and Notice In Rem Issued. (NAhm)
September 20, 2018 Filing 7 Warrant of Arrest and Notice In Rem Issued. (NAhm)
September 20, 2018 Filing 6 Warrant of Arrest and Notice In Rem Issued. (NAhm)
September 20, 2018 Filing 5 Warrant of Arrest and Notice In Rem Issued. (NAhm)
September 20, 2018 Filing 4 Warrant of Arrest and Notice In Rem Issued. (NAhm)
September 20, 2018 Filing 3 Warrant of Arrest and Notice In Rem Issued. (NAhm)
September 20, 2018 Filing 2 Warrant of Arrest and Notice In Rem Issued. (NAhm)
September 14, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Forfeiture filed by United States of America against All Defendants with Jury Demand. No summons requested. No Fee Required - US Government. County of 1st Plaintiff: USA - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Ross, Philip)
September 14, 2018 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SKra)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Currency $31,414 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Currency $76,879.61 from JP Morgan Chase Bank Account No. 965840820
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Currency $2,559.71 from JP Morgan Chase Bank Account No. 2974580629
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Currency $885.07 from JP Morgan Chase Bank Account No. 786002154
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Currency $93,636
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Currency $35,982.64 from Bank of America Account No. 375014498799
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Currency $34,241.73 from JP Morgan Chase Bank Account No. 136321690
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Currency $35,021.47 from Bank of America Account No. 375014022505
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Currency $20,196 from JP Morgan Chase Bank Account No. 830293010
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Currency $5,790.08 from JP Morgan Chase Bank Account No. 807651591
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Currency $521.77 from JP Morgan Chase Bank Account No. 2740498114
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Currency $31,414
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Currency $16,436.91 from Ameriprise Financial brokerage account #0000446753782133
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Currency $1,794.29 from Ameriprise Financial IRA account #0000411251465133
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Currency $12,292.45 from Ameriprise Financial SEP IRA account #0000504843996133
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Philip A. Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: FARES YASIN
Represented By: Mohammed Abdrabboh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Nura Yasin
Represented By: Margaret S. Raben
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Michigan Home Visiting Physicians
Represented By: Mohammed Abdrabboh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: yasin properties
Represented By: Mohammed Abdrabboh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: detroit%20visiting
Represented By: Mohammed Abdrabboh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: ahmed Yasin
Represented By: Mohammed Abdrabboh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Kelly Haynes-Yasin
Represented By: Nineveh S. Korkis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?