Parsad v. Trott Law P.C. et al
Plaintiff: Alireza Parsad and Alireza Parsad [E-Filer]
Defendant: David A. Trott, John Doe, Trott Law P.C. and Jane Doe
Case Number: 2:2018cv12863
Filed: September 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Mona K Majzoub
Referring Judge: Laurie J Michelson
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2018 Filing 18 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Trott Law P.C. (Klaus, Kathleen)
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATED ORDER Dismissing Count IV of #1 Complaint, Only. Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (WBar)
November 5, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION To Dismiss by David A. Trott. (Segal, Bruce)
November 1, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss by Trott Law P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - 8/11/16 Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - 6/29/18 Order, #4 Exhibit C - 7/6/18 Order, #5 Exhibit D - 9/28/18 Order, #6 Exhibit E - 10/15/18 Email) (Klaus, Kathleen)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CORRECTED STIPULATED ORDER Extending Time to Respond to #1 Complaint, ( Responsive Pleading due by 11/5/2018) Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (WBar)
October 30, 2018 Pro Se E-filing Account Created for Alireza Parsad [E-Filer]. (DPer)
October 23, 2018 Filing 13 Pro Se Application for E-filing submitted by Alireza Parsad [APPROVED - PENDING COMPLETION OF ON-LINE TRAINING] (DPer)
October 18, 2018 Filing 12 Pro Se Application for E-filing submitted by Alireza Parsad [NOT APPROVED - APPLICANT FAILED TO INDICATE SCANNING CAPABILITY] (DPer) Modified on 10/19/2018 (DPer).
October 18, 2018 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Alireza Parsad (DPer)
October 18, 2018 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Alireza Parsad (DPer)
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATED ORDER Regarding Defendant David A. Trott's Response to #1 Complaint, ( Responsive Pleading due by 11/4/2018, Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (WBar)
October 11, 2018 Filing 8 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Bruce L. Segal appearing on behalf of David A. Trott (Segal, Bruce)
October 11, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint Trott Law P.C.'s Unopposed Motion for Additional Time to Respond to Complaint by Trott Law P.C.. (Klaus, Kathleen)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint; (Defendant Trott Law PC's Responsive Pleading due by 11/1/2018) Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (WBar)
October 10, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jesse Louis Roth on behalf of Trott Law P.C.. (Roth, Jesse)
October 10, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen H. Klaus on behalf of Trott Law P.C.. (Klaus, Kathleen)
September 18, 2018 Filing 4 Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (KCas)
September 14, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *David A. Trott, Trott Law P.C.* (DAll)
September 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Alireza Parsad against Jane Doe, John Doe, David A. Trott, Trott Law P.C. Receipt No: DET116801 - Fee: $ 400. (DAll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parsad v. Trott Law P.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David A. Trott
Represented By: Bruce L. Segal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trott Law P.C.
Represented By: Kathleen H. Klaus
Represented By: Jesse Louis Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alireza Parsad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alireza Parsad [E-Filer]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?