Tecnomatic S.p.A. v. Atop S.p.A. et al
Plaintiff: Tecnomatic S.p.A.
Defendant: Magneti Marelli S.p.A., Magneti Marelli Holding USA LLC, Atop S.p.A. and Magneti Marelli of Tennessee, LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv12869
Filed: September 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: David R. Grand
Referring Judge: Laurie J Michelson
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:183
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2018 Filing 25 NOTICE by Atop S.p.A. re #16 Notice of Appearance (Bolton, Jordan)
October 24, 2018 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin J. Coon on behalf of Atop S.p.A.. (Coon, Benjamin)
October 24, 2018 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven C. Susser on behalf of Atop S.p.A.. (Susser, Steven)
October 24, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian S. Tobin on behalf of Atop S.p.A.. (Tobin, Brian)
October 22, 2018 RESET Deadlines/Hearings: Scheduling Conference reset for 12/5/2018 02:30 PM before District Judge Laurie J. Michelson (WBar)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #17 Stipulation filed by Defendant Atop S.p.A. to Extend time to Answer #1 Complaint; Responsive Pleading due by 11/30/2018, Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (WBar)
October 19, 2018 Filing 21 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Magneti Marelli S.p.A. identifying Corporate Parent Fiat Chrysler Automobiles N.V. for Magneti Marelli S.p.A.. (Grove, Andrew)
October 19, 2018 Filing 20 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Magneti Marelli Holding USA LLC identifying Corporate Parent Fiat Chrysler Automobiles N.V. for Magneti Marelli Holding USA LLC. (Grove, Andrew)
October 19, 2018 Filing 19 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Magneti Marelli of Tennessee, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Fiat Chrylser Automobiles, N.V. for Magneti Marelli of Tennessee, LLC. (Grove, Andrew)
October 19, 2018 Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Magneti Marelli Holding USA LLC, Magneti Marelli S.p.A., Magneti Marelli of Tennessee, LLC. (Grove, Andrew)
October 19, 2018 Filing 17 STIPULATION Regarding Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by Atop S.p.A. (Bolton, Jordan)
October 19, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan S. Bolton on behalf of Atop S.p.A.. (Bolton, Jordan)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER TO ATTEND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE and Notice of Requirements for Submission of Discovery Plan., ( Scheduling Conference set for 11/29/2018 02:30 PM before District Judge Laurie J. Michelson) Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (WBar)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting #14 Stipulation filed by Magneti Marelli of Tennessee, LLC, Magneti Marelli Holding USA LLC, Magneti Marelli S.p.A., Regarding Time to Answer #1 Complaint; Responsive Pleading due by 10/31/2018, Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (WBar)
October 11, 2018 Filing 14 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint,,,,, REGARDING TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND by Magneti Marelli Holding USA LLC, Magneti Marelli S.p.A., Magneti Marelli of Tennessee, LLC (Grove, Andrew)
October 11, 2018 Filing 13 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Gerald E. McGlynn, III appearing on behalf of Magneti Marelli Holding USA LLC, Magneti Marelli S.p.A., Magneti Marelli of Tennessee, LLC (McGlynn, Gerald)
October 11, 2018 Filing 12 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Andrew M. Grove appearing on behalf of Magneti Marelli Holding USA LLC, Magneti Marelli S.p.A., Magneti Marelli of Tennessee, LLC (Grove, Andrew)
October 2, 2018 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Magneti Marelli Holding USA LLC served on 9/24/2018, answer due 10/15/2018. (Orr, Brian)
September 28, 2018 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Magneti Marelli of Tennessee, LLC served on 9/24/2018, answer due 10/15/2018. (Orr, Brian)
September 25, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by A. Michael Palizzi on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Palizzi, A.)
September 19, 2018 Filing 8 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Autumn L. Sharp appearing on behalf of Tecnomatic S.p.A. (Sharp, Autumn)
September 17, 2018 Filing 7 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Allison Elyse Kahrnoff Pietras appearing on behalf of Tecnomatic S.p.A. (Kahrnoff Pietras, Allison)
September 17, 2018 Filing 6 Patent Report Sent To Washington (Orr, Brian)
September 14, 2018 Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Brian R. Orr appearing on behalf of Tecnomatic S.p.A. (Orr, Brian)
September 14, 2018 Filing 4 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Tecnomatic S.p.A. (Warnecke, Andrew)
September 14, 2018 Filing 3 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Tecnomatic S.p.A. (Warnecke, Andrew)
September 14, 2018 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SKra)
September 14, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Atop S.p.A., Magneti Marelli Holding USA LLC, Magneti Marelli S.p.A., Magneti Marelli of Tennessee, LLC* (SKra)
September 14, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Tecnomatic S.p.A. against Tecnomatic Atop S.p.A., Magneti Marelli S.p.A, Magneti Marelli Holding USA LLC, and Magneti Marelli of Tennessee LLC with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-6904676 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Outside of country - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Outside of country. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24) (Warnecke, Andrew) Modified on 9/14/2018 (EKar). Modified on 9/14/2018 (SKra).[FILED BY Tecnomatic S.p.A. against Atop S.p.A., Magneti Marelli S.p.A, Magneti Marelli Holding USA LLC, and Magneti Marelli of Tennessee LLC]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tecnomatic S.p.A. v. Atop S.p.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Magneti Marelli S.p.A.
Represented By: Gerald E. McGlynn, III
Represented By: Andrew M. Grove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Magneti Marelli Holding USA LLC
Represented By: Gerald E. McGlynn, III
Represented By: Andrew M. Grove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atop S.p.A.
Represented By: Jordan S. Bolton
Represented By: Steven C. Susser
Represented By: Benjamin J. Coon
Represented By: Brian S. Tobin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Magneti Marelli of Tennessee, LLC
Represented By: Gerald E. McGlynn, III
Represented By: Andrew M. Grove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tecnomatic S.p.A.
Represented By: Andrew C. Warnecke
Represented By: Brian R. Orr
Represented By: Autumn L. Sharp
Represented By: A. Michael Palizzi
Represented By: Allison Elyse Kahrnoff Pietras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?