Securities and Exchange Commission v. Romer

Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: Ernest J Romer, III
Case Number: 2:2018cv12927
Filed: September 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Terrence G Berg
Referring Judge: Mona K Majzoub
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:77
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER re #10 Memorandum filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Response or Motion for Default Judgment due by 1/31/2019) Signed by District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (AChu)
November 5, 2018 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM re #9 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings dated October 30, 2018 Regarding the Clerk's Entry of Default by Securities and Exchange Commission (Birkenheier, John)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re #8 Clerks Entry of Default. (Response due by 11/20/2018) Signed by District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (AChu)
October 30, 2018 Filing 8 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to *Ernest J Romer, III* (DWor)
October 30, 2018 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Ernest J Romer, III by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Birkenheier, John)
October 9, 2018 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Ernest J Romer, III served on 9/26/2018, answer due 10/17/2018. (Birkenheier, John)
October 1, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven L. Klawans on behalf of Securities and Exchange Commission. (Klawans, Steven)
September 24, 2018 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Marlene Key-Patterson appearing on behalf of Securities and Exchange Commission (Key-Patterson, Marlene)
September 18, 2018 Filing 3 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: John E. Birkenheier appearing on behalf of Securities and Exchange Commission (Birkenheier, John)
September 18, 2018 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DWor)
September 18, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Ernest J Romer, III* (DWor)
September 18, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Securities and Exchange Commission against Ernest J Romer, III with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. No Fee Required - US Government. County of 1st Plaintiff: USA - County Where Action Arose: Macomb - County of 1st Defendant: Macomb. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): 16th Judicial Circuit Court/Macomb County, 2017-004595-CZ, 2012-003466-CH, 2017-000032-XX, 2017-001829-NZ, 2017-002873-CZ, 2017-004260-NZ, 2017-004385-FH, 2017-004386-FH, 2018-000798-FH, 2018-000799-FH, 2018-000800-FH, 2018-001614-FH, 2018-001615-FH, 2018-001618-FH, 2018-001622-FH, 2018-002858-FH, 2018-002859-FH, 2018-002860-FH, Judge Joseph Toia] (Birkenheier, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Securities and Exchange Commission v. Romer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: John E. Birkenheier
Represented By: Steven L. Klawans
Represented By: Marlene Key-Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ernest J Romer, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?