Consulting & Education Services, Inc. v. Gerber Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Advantage Consulting & Education Services, Inc.
Defendant: Gerber Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2018cv13029
Filed: September 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Mona K Majzoub
Referring Judge: Stephen J Murphy
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATED ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (DPar)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STIPULATED ORDER Extending Deadline to File Response or other Defense to Plaintiff's #1 Complaint, (Response due by 11/16/2018). Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (DPar)
October 11, 2018 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Gerber Life Insurance Company served on 10/2/2018, answer due 10/23/2018. (Sims, David) Modified on 10/11/2018 (SKra).[PARTY REQUESTED ANSWER DUE DATE FOR 10/30/18 FOR CERTIFIED MAIL SERVICE]
September 27, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by John H. Eggertsen on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Eggertsen, John)
September 27, 2018 Filing 3 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Advantage Consulting & Education Services, Inc. (Sims, David)
September 27, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Gerber Life Insurance Company* (DWor)
September 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Advantage Consulting & Education Services, Inc. against Advantage Consulting & Education Services, Inc.. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-6922904 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Westchester. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Sims, David)[COMPLAINT BY ADVANTAGE CONSULTING & EDUCATION SERVICES, INC. AGAINST GERBER LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY] Modified on 9/27/2018 (DPer).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Consulting & Education Services, Inc. v. Gerber Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerber Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Advantage Consulting & Education Services, Inc.
Represented By: David E. Sims
Represented By: John H. Eggertsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?