United States of America v. Federal-Mogul LLC
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Federal-Mogul LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv13205
Filed: October 15, 2018
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Bernard A Friedman
Referring Judge: R Steven Whalen
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 6901
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting Plaintiff's #4 , #5 Motions to Approve Consent Judgment. Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (JCur)
December 4, 2018 Filing 6 CONSENT DECREE. Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (JCur)
November 27, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment Combined with Memo in Support by United States of America. (Loeb, Elizabeth)
November 27, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment by United States of America. (Loeb, Elizabeth)
October 17, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Grant P. Gilezan on behalf of Federal-Mogul LLC. (Gilezan, Grant)
October 15, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE by United States of America of Lodging of proposed Consent Decree (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Consent Decree) (Loeb, Elizabeth)
October 15, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by United States of America against Federal-Mogul LLC. No summons requested. No Fee Required - US Government. County of 1st Plaintiff: Out of State - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Out of State. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Loeb, Elizabeth)
October 15, 2018 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SKra)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Federal-Mogul LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal-Mogul LLC
Represented By: Grant P. Gilezan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Loeb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?