State of California v. Lear Corporation et al
Plaintiff: State of California
Defendant: Kyungshin-Lear Sales and Engineering, LLC and Lear Corporation
Case Number: 2:2018cv13210
Filed: October 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Stephanie Dawkins Davis
Referring Judge: Mark A Goldsmith
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Sandusky, K)
October 23, 2018 Filing 6 EXHIBIT #2 Settlement Agreement by State of California (Banerjee, Anik) Modified on 10/24/2018 (EKar).
October 19, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Correction re 4 Summons Issued, 3 Summons Issued. (EKar) Modified on 10/19/2018 (EKar). Summons issued in error.
October 16, 2018 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (EKar)
October 15, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by State of California (Banerjee, Anik)
October 15, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Damages, Civil Penalties, and Injunctive Relief filed by State of California against All Defendants with Jury Demand. No summons requested. Receipt No: 0645-6946682 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Out of State - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Out of State. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): United States District Court Eastern District of Michigan, 12-md-02311, Judge Hon. Marianne O. Battanni] (Banerjee, Anik)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State of California v. Lear Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of California
Represented By: Anik Banerjee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyungshin-Lear Sales and Engineering, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lear Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?