Souedan v. Nielsen et al

Defendant: Secretary DHS Kirstjen Nielsen, Rebecca Adducci and Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III
Petitioner: Ibrahim Youssif Souedan
Case Number: 2:2018cv13313
Filed: October 23, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Stephanie Dawkins Davis
Referring Judge: Gershwin A Drain
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Granting Petitioner's #7 Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (TMcg)
October 29, 2018 Filing 8 RESPONSE to #7 MOTION to Dismiss Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, voluntarily filed by All Defendants. (Helms, Brandon)
October 29, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, voluntarily by Ibrahim Youssif Souedan. (Ayad, Nabih)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM OPINION in Support of Court's Order #5 Denying Petitioner's #2 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order to Stay 10/24/18-4PM removal flight Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (TMcg)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Denying Petitioner's Emergency #2 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (TMcg)
October 24, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Brandon C. Helms on behalf of Rebecca Adducci, Kirstjen Nielsen, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III. (Helms, Brandon)
October 24, 2018 Filing 3 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: James J. Carty appearing on behalf of Rebecca Adducci, Kirstjen Nielsen, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III (Carty, James)
October 23, 2018 Filing 2 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order to Stay 10/24/18-4PM removal flight by Ibrahim Youssif Souedan. (Ayad, Nabih)
October 23, 2018 Filing 1 Emergency PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus Regarding Deportation filed by Ibrahim Youssif Souedan against All Defendants, Receipt No: 0645-6959604 - Fee: 5 dollars. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A - Motion to Reopen with Exhibits, and Motion to Stay) (Ayad, Nabih)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Souedan v. Nielsen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary DHS Kirstjen Nielsen
Represented By: James J. Carty
Represented By: Brandon C. Helms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca Adducci
Represented By: James J. Carty
Represented By: Brandon C. Helms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III
Represented By: James J. Carty
Represented By: Brandon C. Helms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ibrahim Youssif Souedan
Represented By: Nabih H. Ayad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?