Dayco Products LLC v. Multi Parts Supply USA Inc.
Plaintiff: Dayco Products LLC
Defendant: Multi Parts Supply USA Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv13343
Filed: October 25, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Nancy G Edmunds
Referring Judge: Anthony P Patti
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2018 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses , COUNTERCLAIM filed by Multi Parts Supply USA Inc. against Dayco Products LLC by Multi Parts Supply USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Ellis, Nicholas)
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order Vacating #6 Order to Show Cause - Signed by District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds. (LBar)
November 7, 2018 Filing 7 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Dayco Products LLC. (Killips, Jason)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER for Dayco Products LLC to Show Cause why this case should not be dismissed for lack of federal jurisdiction, specifically the lack of complete diversity of parties as required by 18:1332(a) - Signed by District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds. (LBar)
October 25, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued for *Multi Parts Supply USA Inc.* (ATee)
October 25, 2018 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (ATee)
October 25, 2018 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Daniel N. Sharkey appearing on behalf of Dayco Products LLC (Sharkey, Daniel)
October 25, 2018 Filing 3 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Dayco Products LLC identifying Corporate Parent Dayco Products LLC for Dayco Products LLC. (Killips, Jason)
October 25, 2018 Filing 2 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Dayco Products LLC identifying Corporate Parent Dayco Products LLC for Dayco Products LLC. (Killips, Jason)
October 25, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Dayco Products LLC against Multi Parts Supply USA Inc.. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-6962700 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland County, MI - County Where Action Arose: Oakland County, MI - County of 1st Defendant: Palm Beach County, FL. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Killips, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dayco Products LLC v. Multi Parts Supply USA Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Multi Parts Supply USA Inc.
Represented By: Nicholas J. Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dayco Products LLC
Represented By: Daniel N. Sharkey
Represented By: Jason D. Killips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?