Bank of America NA v. GREGGCO MANAGEMENT COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: Bank of America NA
Defendant: GREGGCO MANAGEMENT COMPANY, G.S. Foods Inc and Mr Gregory Scott
Case Number: 2:2018cv13441
Filed: November 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Avern Cohn
Referring Judge: R Steven Whalen
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2018 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #10 MOTION re #9 MOTION for Immediate Access to Real Property (Plaintiff's Statement of Undisputed Material Facts in Support of its Motion for Immediate Access to Real Property, #9 MOTION for Immediate Access to Real Property by Bank of America NA (Cronk, Peter)
December 19, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION re #9 MOTION for Immediate Access to Real Property (Plaintiff's Statement of Undisputed Material Facts in Support of its Motion for Immediate Access to Real Property by Bank of America NA. (Cronk, Peter)
December 19, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Immediate Access to Real Property by Bank of America NA. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A-Promissory Note, #3 Exhibit B-Mortgage, #4 Exhibit C-Demand for Access) (Cronk, Peter)
December 11, 2018 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Gregory Scott served on 12/4/2018, answer due 12/26/2018. (Cronk, Peter)
December 11, 2018 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. GREGGCO MANAGEMENT COMPANY served on 12/4/2018, answer due 12/26/2018. (Cronk, Peter)
December 11, 2018 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. G.S. Foods Inc served on 12/4/2018, answer due 12/26/2018. (Cronk, Peter)
November 2, 2018 Filing 5 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Bank of America NA identifying Corporate Parent Bank of America, NA for Bank of America NA. (Cronk, Peter)
November 2, 2018 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (EKar)
November 2, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued for *Gregory Scott* (EKar)
November 2, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for *GREGGCO MANAGEMENT COMPANY* (EKar)
November 2, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *G.S. Foods Inc* (EKar)
November 2, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Breach of Notes, Enforcement of Guaranties, Claim and Delivery, Appointment of Receiver and Judicial Foreclosure filed by Bank of America NA against Bank of America NA. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-6975036 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: WAYNE - County Where Action Arose: WAYNE - County of 1st Defendant: MECKLENBURG NC. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H) (Cronk, Peter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bank of America NA v. GREGGCO MANAGEMENT COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bank of America NA
Represented By: Peter D. Cronk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREGGCO MANAGEMENT COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G.S. Foods Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr Gregory Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?