Edwards v. Meisner et al

Plaintiff: John D. Edwards
Defendant: Southfield Neighbothood Revitalization Initiative, LLC, Daniel Brightwell, Myron Frasier, Irv Lowenberg, Frederick Zorn, Habitat for Humanity, Donald Fracassi, Etoile Libbett, Nancy Banks, Ken Silvers, Mitchell Simon, Rita Hillman, Lora Brantley-Gilbert, Andy Meisner, Southfield, City of, Southfield Non Profit Housing Corporation, Earlene Trayler-Neal, Oakland County, Sue Ward-Witkowski, Lloyd Crews and Michael Mandlebaum
Case Number: 2:2018cv13488
Filed: November 8, 2018
Court: Michigan Eastern District Court
0 Judge: Paul D Borman
1 Judge: Anthony P Patti
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
January 2, 2019 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #27 Judgment, #26 Order on Motion for TRO on John D. Edwards AT 25055 W Ten Mile Rd, Southfield, MI 48033. (DTof)
January 2, 2019 27 JUDGMENT - Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (DTof)
January 2, 2019 26 Featured Case OPINION AND ORDER denying #8 Motion for TRO AND DISMISSING COMPLAINT.. Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (DTof)
December 28, 2018 25 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #24 MOTION to Dismiss by Lora Brantley-Gilbert, Rita Hillman, Etoile Libbett, Mitchell Simon, Southfield Neighbothood Revitalization Initiative, LLC, Southfield Non Profit Housing Corporation, Earlene Trayler-Neal (Couvreur, Joseph)
December 28, 2018 24 MOTION to Dismiss by Lora Brantley-Gilbert, Rita Hillman, Etoile Libbett, Mitchell Simon, Southfield Neighbothood Revitalization Initiative, LLC, Southfield Non Profit Housing Corporation, Earlene Trayler-Neal. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit) (Couvreur, Joseph)
December 27, 2018 23 MOTION to Dismiss by Nancy Banks, Daniel Brightwell, Lloyd Crews, Donald Fracassi, Myron Frasier, Irv Lowenberg, Michael Mandlebaum, Ken Silvers, Southfield, City of, Sue Ward-Witkowski, Frederick Zorn. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit) (Knoblock, Michael)
December 20, 2018 22 MOTION to Dismiss by Andy Meisner, Oakland County. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-6 of Motion to Dismiss) (Mann, William)
December 18, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Paul D. Borman: Motion Hearing held on 12/18/2018 re #8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by John D. Edwards Disposition: Motion taken under advisement (Court Reporter: Leann Lizza) (DTof)
December 14, 2018 21 RESPONSE to #8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Habitat for Humanity. (Van Dusen, Thomas)
December 13, 2018 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas P. Van Dusen on behalf of Habitat for Humanity. (Van Dusen, Thomas)
December 13, 2018 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph G. Couvreur on behalf of Lora Brantley-Gilbert, Rita Hillman, Etoile Libbett, Mitchell Simon, Southfield Neighbothood Revitalization Initiative, LLC, Southfield Non Profit Housing Corporation, Earlene Trayler-Neal. (Couvreur, Joseph)
December 12, 2018 18 REPLY to [Southfield Neighborhood REvitalization Initiative, LLC's] Response re #8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by John D. Edwards. (NAhm)
December 7, 2018 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #17 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, on John D. Edwards at 25055 W Ten Mile Rd,Southfield, MI 48033. (DTof)
December 7, 2018 17 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part #16 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Reply due by 12/12/2018. Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (DTof)
December 6, 2018 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply as to #8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by John D. Edwards. (SSch)
December 3, 2018 15 RESPONSE to #8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Nancy Banks, Daniel Brightwell, Lloyd Crews, Donald Fracassi, Myron Frasier, Irv Lowenberg, Michael Mandlebaum, Ken Silvers, Southfield, City of, Sue Ward-Witkowski, Frederick Zorn. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit) (Knoblock, Michael)
December 3, 2018 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A. Knoblock on behalf of Nancy Banks, Daniel Brightwell, Lloyd Crews, Donald Fracassi, Myron Frasier, Irv Lowenberg, Michael Mandlebaum, Ken Silvers, Southfield, City of, Sue Ward-Witkowski, Frederick Zorn. (Knoblock, Michael)
December 3, 2018 13 RESPONSE to #8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Southfield Neighbothood Revitalization Initiative, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit) (Couvreur, Joseph)
November 29, 2018 11 NOTICE of Appearance by T. Joseph Seward on behalf of Nancy Banks, Daniel Brightwell, Lloyd Crews, Donald Fracassi, Myron Frasier, Irv Lowenberg, Michael Mandlebaum, Ken Silvers, Southfield, City of, Sue Ward-Witkowski, Frederick Zorn. (Seward, T.)
November 26, 2018 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re Order to Vacate on John D. Edwards at 25055 W Ten Mile Rd,Southfield, MI 48033. (DTof)
November 26, 2018 Featured Case TEXT-ONLY ORDER Vacating #6 Order Referring Pretrial Matters to Magistrate Judge. Entered by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (DTof)
November 26, 2018 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #10 Notice of Hearing on Motion, on John D. Edwards at 25055 W Ten Mile Rd, Southfield MI 48033. (DTof)
November 26, 2018 10 NOTICE OF HEARING on #8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. Response due by 12/3/2018 Reply due by 12/6/2018 Motion Hearing set for 12/18/2018 03:30 PM before District Judge Paul D. Borman (DTof)
November 26, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Paul D. Borman: Telephonic Status Conference held on 11/26/2018. (Court Reporter: Leann Lizza) (DTof)
November 21, 2018 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by John D. Edwards (SSch)
November 21, 2018 8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by John D. Edwards. (SSch)
November 20, 2018 12 ACKNOWLEDGMENT from U.S. Marshal Service of Receipt of Service of Process Documents. (DPer)
November 20, 2018 7 SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation, #2 Document Continuation, #3 Document Continuation, #4 Document Continuation, #5 Document Continuation, #6 Document Continuation, #7 Document Continuation, #8 Document Continuation, #9 Document Continuation, #10 Document Continuation, #11 Document Continuation, #12 Document Continuation, #13 Document Continuation, #14 Document Continuation, #15 Document Continuation, #16 Document Continuation, #17 Document Continuation, #18 Document Continuation, #19 Document Continuation, #20 Document Continuation) (SSch)
November 13, 2018 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #5 Order on Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs, #6 Order Referring Pretrial Matters to Magistrate Judge on John D. Edwards at 25055 W Ten Mile Rd,Southfield, MI 48033. (DTof)
November 13, 2018 6 Featured Case ORDER Referring Pretrial Matters to Magistrate Judge Anthony P. Patti. Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (DTof)
November 13, 2018 5 Featured Case ORDER granting #2 Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs and granting request for service by the U.S. Marshal. Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (DTof)
November 9, 2018 4 Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (KCas)
November 8, 2018 2 APPLICATION to Proceed without prepaying fees or costs by John D. Edwards. (SSch)
November 8, 2018 1 COMPLAINT filed by John D. Edwards against All Defendants (SSch)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edwards v. Meisner et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southfield Neighbothood Revitalization Initiative, LLC
Represented By: Joseph G. Couvreur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Brightwell
Represented By: T. Joseph Seward
Represented By: Michael A. Knoblock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Myron Frasier
Represented By: T. Joseph Seward
Represented By: Michael A. Knoblock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Irv Lowenberg
Represented By: T. Joseph Seward
Represented By: Michael A. Knoblock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frederick Zorn
Represented By: T. Joseph Seward
Represented By: Michael A. Knoblock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Habitat for Humanity
Represented By: Thomas P. Van Dusen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Fracassi
Represented By: T. Joseph Seward
Represented By: Michael A. Knoblock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Etoile Libbett
Represented By: Joseph G. Couvreur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Banks
Represented By: T. Joseph Seward
Represented By: Michael A. Knoblock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Silvers
Represented By: T. Joseph Seward
Represented By: Michael A. Knoblock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitchell Simon
Represented By: Joseph G. Couvreur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rita Hillman
Represented By: Joseph G. Couvreur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lora Brantley-Gilbert
Represented By: Joseph G. Couvreur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andy Meisner
Represented By: William J. Mann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southfield, City of
Represented By: T. Joseph Seward
Represented By: Michael A. Knoblock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southfield Non Profit Housing Corporation
Represented By: Joseph G. Couvreur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Earlene Trayler-Neal
Represented By: Joseph G. Couvreur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oakland County
Represented By: William J. Mann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sue Ward-Witkowski
Represented By: T. Joseph Seward
Represented By: Michael A. Knoblock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lloyd Crews
Represented By: T. Joseph Seward
Represented By: Michael A. Knoblock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Mandlebaum
Represented By: T. Joseph Seward
Represented By: Michael A. Knoblock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John D. Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?