Deloney v. Grand Trunk Western Railroad Company
Plaintiff: Artis Deloney
Defendant: Grand Trunk Western Railroad Company
Case Number: 2:2018cv13653
Filed: November 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Avern Cohn
Referring Judge: Mona K Majzoub
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO APPEAR: Status Conference set for 2/7/2019 02:00 PM before District Judge Avern Cohn (MVer)
January 10, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Grand Trunk Western Railroad Company. (O'Donnell, Mary)
January 7, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Grand Trunk Western Railroad Company served on 12/26/2018, answer due 1/16/2019. (Wilensky, Benjamin)
November 21, 2018 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SKra)
November 21, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for *Grand Trunk Western Railroad Company* (SKra)
November 21, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin J. Wilensky on behalf of Artis Deloney. (Wilensky, Benjamin)
November 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Artis Deloney against Grand Trunk Western Railroad Company with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7000204 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Genesee - County Where Action Arose: Eaton - County of 1st Defendant: Ingham. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Pearlman, Arvin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Deloney v. Grand Trunk Western Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grand Trunk Western Railroad Company
Represented By: Mary C. O'Donnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Artis Deloney
Represented By: Benjamin J. Wilensky
Represented By: Arvin J. Pearlman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?