Great Lakes Transportation Holding L.L.C., d/b/a Metro Cars v. MBC Airport Transportation, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Great Lakes Transportation Holding L.L.C., d/b/a Metro Cars
Defendant: MBC Airport Transportation, LLC and Basheer Elhubishi
Case Number: 2:2018cv13680
Filed: November 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Paul D Borman
Referring Judge: Anthony P Patti
2 Judge: Arthur J Tarnow
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2019 Filing 8 Trademark Report Sent To Washington (SSch)
January 15, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATED PERMANENT INJUNCTION. Signed by District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow. (MLan)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Re: Disqualification of Judge. REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Paul D. Borman to District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow. (NAhm)
December 10, 2018 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE re #5 Order Requiring Responsive Pleading: RESPONSE GIVEN. (DTof)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Requiring Plaintiff to disclose LLC members. Response due by 12/21/2018 Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (DTof)
November 27, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued for *MBC Airport Transportation, LLC* (DWor)
November 27, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued for *Basheer Elhubishi* (DWor)
November 26, 2018 Filing 2 Trademark Report Sent To Washington (Wheaton, Jill)
November 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Great Lakes Transportation Holding L.L.C., d/b/a Metro Cars against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7002403 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D) (Wheaton, Jill)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Great Lakes Transportation Holding L.L.C., d/b/a Metro Cars v. MBC Airport Transportation, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Great Lakes Transportation Holding L.L.C., d/b/a Metro Cars
Represented By: Jill M. Wheaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MBC Airport Transportation, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Basheer Elhubishi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?