Manny's Auto Supply, Inc. et al v. Boysen USA, LLC

Plaintiff: Manny's Auto Supply, Inc. and Irving Levine Automotive Distributors, Inc.
Defendant: Boysen USA, LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv13688
Filed: November 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Marianne O Battani
Referring Judge: Mona K Majzoub
2 Judge: Laurie J Michelson
3 Judge: Elizabeth A Stafford
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 20, 2019 Filing 11 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Matthew J. Turchyn appearing on behalf of Boysen USA, LLC (Turchyn, Matthew)
January 20, 2019 Filing 10 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Bradley J. Schram appearing on behalf of Boysen USA, LLC (Schram, Bradley)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Laurie J. Michelson and Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford to District Judge Marianne O. Battani and Magistrate Judge Mona K. Majzoub. (NAhm)
November 28, 2018 Filing 8 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Michael S. Smith appearing on behalf of Irving Levine Automotive Distributors, Inc., Manny's Auto Supply, Inc. (Smith, Michael)
November 28, 2018 Filing 7 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Randall B. Weill appearing on behalf of Irving Levine Automotive Distributors, Inc., Manny's Auto Supply, Inc. (Weill, Randall)
November 28, 2018 Filing 6 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Gregory P. Hansel appearing on behalf of Irving Levine Automotive Distributors, Inc., Manny's Auto Supply, Inc. (Hansel, Gregory)
November 27, 2018 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DWor)
November 27, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued for *Boysen USA, LLC* (DWor)
November 26, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Darryl Bressack on behalf of Irving Levine Automotive Distributors, Inc., Manny's Auto Supply, Inc.. (Bressack, Darryl)
November 26, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan J. Fink on behalf of Irving Levine Automotive Distributors, Inc., Manny's Auto Supply, Inc.. (Fink, Nathan)
November 26, 2018 Filing 2 SEALED Complaint by Irving Levine Automotive Distributors, Inc., Manny's Auto Supply, Inc.. (Fink, David)
November 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (REDACTED) filed by Manny's Auto Supply, Inc., Irving Levine Automotive Distributors, Inc. against Boysen USA, LLC with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7002882 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Out of State - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Out of State. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): Eastern District of Michigan, 12-md-2311; 16-cv-3701, Judge Marianne O. Battani] (Fink, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Manny's Auto Supply, Inc. et al v. Boysen USA, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boysen USA, LLC
Represented By: Matthew J. Turchyn
Represented By: Bradley J. Schram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manny's Auto Supply, Inc.
Represented By: Darryl Bressack
Represented By: David H. Fink
Represented By: Nathan J. Fink
Represented By: Gregory P. Hansel
Represented By: Randall B. Weill
Represented By: Michael S. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irving Levine Automotive Distributors, Inc.
Represented By: Darryl Bressack
Represented By: David H. Fink
Represented By: Nathan J. Fink
Represented By: Gregory P. Hansel
Represented By: Randall B. Weill
Represented By: Michael S. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?